McKenzie County, North Dakota v. United States of America
Plaintiff: McKenzie County, North Dakota
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2023cv00094
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Schoepf, Michael)
July 7, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McKenzie County, North Dakota. United States of America served on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Bettencourt, Danielle)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case Reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(mf)
May 30, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by McKenzie County, North Dakota. (mf)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lee Katherine Goldstein. (jb)
May 18, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lee Katherine Goldstein (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2671210) by McKenzie County, North Dakota. (Goldstein, Lee) Modified on 5/19/2023 to add receipt number. (jb)
May 15, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mf)
May 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to McKenzie County, North Dakota. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/30/2023. (mf)
May 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100001105) filed by McKenzie County, North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie County, North Dakota v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKenzie County, North Dakota
Represented By: Ty L. Skarda
Represented By: Danielle Bettencourt
Represented By: Lee Katherine Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?