Short et al v. Billings County et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Short, David Short, Donald Short and Sarah Sarbacker
Defendant: Billings County, Lester Iverson, Steven Klym and Dean Rodne
Case Number: 1:2023cv00143
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2023 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short. (Purdon, Timothy)
September 18, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Billings County, Lester Iverson, Steven Klym, Dean Rodne. (Norgard, Tami)
September 6, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kylie Sollie on behalf of All Defendants (Sollie, Kylie)
September 6, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Tami Norgard on behalf of All Defendants (Norgard, Tami)
September 6, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Bennett L. Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Bennett)
September 5, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 9/18/2023 Replies due by 9/25/2023. (cjs)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor denying #14 Motion to Expedite Review of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and setting the following schedule: Defendants shall file formal notices of appearance by counsel no later than 9/11/2023.Responses to #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 9/18/2023.Replies due 9/25/2023. (CK)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned to the case.(jg)
August 23, 2023 Filing 23 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Status Conference held on 8/23/2023. (LC)
August 21, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Short, Sarah Sarbacker, Sandra Short, Donald Short. Dean Rodne waiver sent on 8/11/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Hurt, Austin)
August 21, 2023 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Short, Sarah Sarbacker, Sandra Short, Donald Short. Steven Klym waiver sent on 8/11/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Hurt, Austin)
August 21, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Short, Sarah Sarbacker, Sandra Short, Donald Short. Lester Iverson waiver sent on 8/11/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Hurt, Austin)
August 21, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Short, Sarah Sarbacker, Sandra Short, Donald Short. Billings County waiver sent on 8/11/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Hurt, Austin)
August 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt Leighton on behalf of Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short (Leighton, Matt)
August 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Hurt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hurt, Austin)
August 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/23/2023 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Call-in instructions previously provided by email. (LC)
August 18, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Expedite Review of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short. (Purdon, Timothy)
August 18, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Review of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short. (Purdon, Timothy)
August 18, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of David Short) re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Resolution No. 2023-13, #3 Exhibit 3 - Offer to Purchase - Sandra Short, #4 Exhibit 4 - Offer to Purchase - David E Short, #5 Exhibit 5 - Offer to Purchase - Donald T Short)(Purdon, Timothy)
August 18, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short. (Purdon, Timothy)
August 18, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sarah Sarbacker, David Short, Donald Short, Sandra Short. (Purdon, Timothy)
August 8, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Sandra Short. (mf)
August 8, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Donald Short. (mf)
August 8, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by David Short. (mf)
August 8, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Sarah Sarbacker. (mf)
August 2, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sarah Sarbacker. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/16/2023. (cjs)
August 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to David Short. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/16/2023. (cjs)
August 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Donald Short. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/16/2023. (cjs)
August 2, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sandra Short. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/16/2023. (cjs)
August 2, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Billings County, Lester Iverson, Steven Klym, Dean Rodne. (cjs)
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Billings County, Lester Iverson, Steven Klym, Dean Rodne (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100001326) filed by David Short, Sarah Sarbacker, Sandra Short, Donald Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-April 14, 2020 Commission Agenda, #2 Exhibit 2-April 14, 2020 Board Minutes, #3 Exhibit 3-April 6, 2021 Board Minutes, #4 Exhibit 4-July 6, 2021 Board Minutes, #5 Exhibit 5-July 6, 2021 Norgard Email, #6 Exhibit 6-July 29, 2021 Email sending Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7-July 29, 2021 County letter with Settlement Agreement, #8 Exhibit 8-Settlement Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9-November 9, 2021 Board Minutes, #10 Exhibit 10-August 3, 2021 Board Minutes, #11 Exhibit 11-September 7, 2021 Board Minutes, #12 Exhibit 12-October 7, 2021 Board Minutes, #13 Exhibit 13-November 9, 2021 Board Minutes, #14 Exhibit 14-February 7, 2023 Board Minutes, #15 Exhibit 15-April 4, 2023 Board Minutes, #16 Exhibit 16-Offer Letter, #17 Exhibit 17-Option Contract, #18 Exhibit 18-Norgard Email, #19 Exhibit 19-August 3, 2023 Billings County Commission Meeting Agenda, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short et al v. Billings County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Short
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: Austin Hurt
Represented By: Matt Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Short
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: Austin Hurt
Represented By: Matt Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Short
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: Matt Leighton
Represented By: Austin Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Sarbacker
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: Matt Leighton
Represented By: Austin Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billings County
Represented By: Bennett L. Johnson
Represented By: Kylie Sollie
Represented By: Tami Norgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Iverson
Represented By: Tami Norgard,
Represented By: Bennett L. Johnson,
Represented By: Kylie Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Klym
Represented By: Bennett L. Johnson,
Represented By: Kylie Sollie
Represented By: Tami Norgard,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Rodne
Represented By: Bennett L. Johnson,
Represented By: Tami Norgard,
Represented By: Kylie Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?