Northland Royalty Corp. v. XTO Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Northland Royalty Corp.
Defendant: XTO Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00194
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Tiblets, Elizabeth)
November 24, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Tiblets, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. An amended complaint has been filed. See Doc. No. 7. (MM)
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Northland Royalty Corp.. (Bruner, Rachel)
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against XTO Energy, Inc. filed by Northland Royalty Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 - Oct 8, 2013 Letter from XTO to Nortland, #2 Exhibit 16 - Mar 6, 2014 Letter from XTO to Northland, #3 Exhibit 17 - Jan 27, 2014 Invitation to Participate-Jorgenson 41X-6, #4 Exhibit 18 - Feb 13, 2014 Invitation to Participate-William Federal 41X-6C, #5 Exhibit 19 - Feb 13, 2014 Invitation to Participate-William Federal 41X-6H, #6 Exhibit 20 - Feb 25, 2014 Invitation to Participate-William 41X-6)(Pelham, Zachary)
October 23, 2023 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Tiblets, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by XTO Energy, Inc.. (Tiblets, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, remains as referral judge, for all further proceedings. (jg)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Judge Daniel M. Traynor recused. (CK)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to XTO Energy, Inc. (mf)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XTO Energy, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100001484) filed by Northland Royalty Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - William Loree Lease 12/21/2009, #3 Exhibit 2 - Jane Loree Quiet Title, #4 Exhibit 3 - Jane Loree Lease 11/29/2011, #5 Exhibit 4 - Assignment of the William Loree Lease 3/24/2014, #6 Exhibit 5 - Revenue Statement 11/30/2022, #7 Exhibit 6 -Revenue Statement 1/25/2023, #8 Exhibit 7 - Revenue Statement 9/19/2014, #9 Exhibit 8 - Revenue Statement 8/20/2014, #10 Exhibit 9 - Revenue Statement 9/19/2014, #11 Exhibit 10 - Personal Representative mineral deed, 4/13/2014, #12 Exhibit 11 - Personal Representative mineral deed, 5/4/2015, #13 Exhibit 12 - Personal Representative mineral deed, 5/17/2015, #14 Exhibit 13 - Personal Representative mineral deed, 4/16/2016, #15 Exhibit 14 - Personal Representative mineral deed, 4/16/2016)(mf) Modified on 10/2/2023 to add receipt number (mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northland Royalty Corp. v. XTO Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northland Royalty Corp.
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Represented By: Elizabeth Tiblets
Represented By: Jeffrey C King
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?