Klein v. Klein et al
Plaintiff: Bruce G. Klein
Defendant: Jelena M. Bouret, Gregory D. Klein, Wesley J. Klein, Jeffrey G. Klein, Jelena M. Barfield and Jelena M. Bouret/Barfield
Case Number: 1:2023cv00223
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2024 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(GW) Distributed on 1/10/2024 (mf)
January 4, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce G. Klein. Jeffrey G. Klein served on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023 (jb)
January 4, 2024 Filing 18 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jelena M. Bouret/Barfield. (jb)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Wesley J. Klein. (jb)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Gregory D. Klein. (jb)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Wesley J. Klein. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/5/2024. (jb)
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gregory D. Klein. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/5/2024. (jb)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gregory D. Klein, Wesley J. Klein. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Appearance)(Nyhus, Christopher) Modified on 12/22/2023 to clean up docket text. (jb)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jelena M. Bouret/Barfield. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/3/2024. (jb)
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jelena M. Bouret/Barfield re #9 Notice of Appearance, #10 Answer to Complaint (Winbauer, Katie)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jelena M. Bouret/Barfield.(Winbauer, Katie)
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie L Winbauer on behalf of Jelena M. Bouret/Barfield (Winbauer, Katie)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bruce G. Klein. (jb)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce G. Klein. Wesley J. Klein served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023 (jb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2024: #1 USPS Green Card Returned Signed) (jb). Modified on 1/4/2024 to add USPS green card. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce G. Klein. Gregory D. Klein served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023 (jb)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce G. Klein. Jelena M. Bouret/Barfield served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023 (jb)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Bruce G. Klein. (cjs)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jelena M. Bouret, Gregory D. Klein, Jeffrey G. Klein, Wesley J. Klein. (mf)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bruce G. Klein. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/30/2023. (mf)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jelena M. Bouret, Gregory D. Klein, Jeffrey G. Klein, Wesley J. Klein (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100001615) filed by Bruce G. Klein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Klein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jelena M. Bouret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Klein
Represented By: Christopher J. Nyhus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley J. Klein
Represented By: Christopher J. Nyhus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey G. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jelena M. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jelena M. Bouret/Barfield
Represented By: Katie L Winbauer
Represented By: Clark Jay Bormann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce G. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?