Falkirk Mining Company, The v. United States Department of the Interior, The et al
Plaintiff: Falkirk Mining Company, The
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior, The, Debra Ann Haaland, Bureau of Land Management, The, Tracy Stone-Manning and Sonya Germann
Case Number: 1:2024cv00040
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 1276 Interior: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Bureau of Land Management, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone-Manning, and The United States Department of the Interior answer due 5/10/2024. DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Clerk's Office added dates of service for all parties and answer due date. (sc)
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Falkirk Mining Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amended Application)(Mann, Wade)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Falkirk Mining Company. The Bureau of Land Management served on 3/6/2024, Sonya Germann served on 3/6/2024, Debra Ann Haaland served on 3/8/2024, Tracy Stone-Manning served on 3/6/2024, The United States Department of the Interior served on 3/8/2024, US Attorney District of North Dakota served on 3/5/2024, and US Department of Justice and US Attorney's Office served on 3/11/2024. Answer due 5/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Attorney Office, District of North Dakota, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bureau of Land Management, #3 Exhibit 3 - Tracy Stone-Manning, BLM, #4 Exhibit 4 - Debra Ann Haaland, US Dept of Interior, #5 Exhibit 5 - US Dept of Interior, #6 Exhibit 6 - Merrick B. Garland, US Dept of Justice, #7 Exhibit 7 - US Attorney's Office, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sonya Germann, BLM, Montana/Dakotas Office)(Mann, Wade) Modified to add dates of service and answer due date on 4/5/2024 (sc).
March 19, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Robert Van de Stouwe on behalf of All Defendants (Van de Stouwe, Erik)
March 8, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Falkirk Mining Company, The identifying Corporate Parent NACCO Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate NACCO Natural Resources Corporation for Falkirk Mining Company, The.. (Mann, Wade)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (mf)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Falkirk Mining Company, The. (mf)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, The, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone-Manning, United States Department of the Interior, The, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mf)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Falkirk Mining Company, The. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/15/2024. (mf)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management, The, Sonya Germann, Debra Ann Haaland, Tracy Stone-Manning, United States Department of the Interior, The (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100001900) filed by Falkirk Mining Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Application, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amended Application, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falkirk Mining Company, The v. United States Department of the Interior, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falkirk Mining Company, The
Represented By: Wade C. Mann
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Represented By: Joshua Brent Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior, The
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Ann Haaland
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, The
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Stone-Manning
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Germann
Represented By: Erik Robert Van de Stouwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?