Hendrickson v. Univar Solutions USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Hendrickson
Defendant: Univar Solutions USA Inc., Univar Solutions USA LLC and Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00060
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (mf)
May 23, 2024 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC, Univar Solutions USA Inc., Univar Solutions USA LLC. (mf)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
May 10, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Univar Solutions USA LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/24/2024. (jb)
May 10, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Univar Solutions USA Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/24/2024. (jb)
May 10, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/24/2024. (jb)
May 9, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Hansmeier on behalf of Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC, Univar Solutions USA Inc., Univar Solutions USA LLC (Hansmeier, Gordon)
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC, Univar Solutions USA Inc., Univar Solutions USA LLC.(Hansmeier, Gordon)
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hendrickson. Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024; Univar Solutions USA LLC served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024 (Johnson, Ariston)
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by James Hendrickson. (jb)
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to James Hendrickson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/6/2024. (cjs)
April 10, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC, Univar Solutions USA Inc., Univar Solutions USA LLC. (mf)
April 10, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to James Hendrickson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/24/2024. (mf)
April 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC, Univar Solutions USA Inc., Univar Solutions USA LLC (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100002017) filed by James Hendrickson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrickson v. Univar Solutions USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hendrickson
Represented By: Ariston Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions USA Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions USA LLC
Represented By: Gordon H. Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions USA I&S LLC
Represented By: Gordon H. Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?