H2M, Inc. v. Boedigheimer et al

Plaintiff: H2M, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, Annoying Orange, Inc., Dane Boedigheimer, Annoying Orange, LLC and Spencer Grove
Case Number: 3:2013cv00031
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southeastern Office
County: Cass
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Erickson
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2015 Civil Case Terminated. (lf)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson ADOPTING #113 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by H2M, Inc. This action, including all claims that were or could have been asserted, is hereby dismissed with prejudice and on the merits, without fees or costs to any party. (RP)
April 3, 2015 Filing 113 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by H2M, Inc.. (Sheu, Edward)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson ADOPTING #111 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Spencer Grove filed by H2M, Inc. This action against Defendant Spencer Grove, including all claims that were or could have been asserted in this action, is HEREBY DISMISSED with prejudice and without fees or costs to any party. (RP)
April 2, 2015 Filing 111 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by H2M, Inc.. (Sheu, Edward)
February 6, 2015 Filing 110 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial REset for 6/15/2015 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson. Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2015 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson. (Change in location and Judge.)(as)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson. Case assigned to Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
February 6, 2015 Filing 108 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (as)
January 23, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2015 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (10 days)(kmk)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER AND NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson. Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein no longer assigned to the case. Any previously scheduled hearings remain set for the same date and time.
December 9, 2014 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #105 Reply to Response to Motion. Clerk's office added filers Spencer Grove, Dane Boedigheimer, Annoying Orange, LLC. (lh)
December 8, 2014 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Annoying Orange, Inc., Spencer Grove, Dane Boedigheimer, Annoying Orange, LLC (Culver, Michael) Modified on 12/9/2014 to add filers (lh).
November 21, 2014 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #103 Affidavit - Clerk's office added link to #102 and added descriptions to attachments. CORRECTION re: #104 Affidavit - Clerk's office separated attachment 6 into separate exhibits 4 and 5, and added descriptions to attachments. Per the Court's Administrative Policy, Section XIII, all attachments must be filed separately and include a description of the document (not just the exhibit number or letter). (lh)
November 19, 2014 Filing 104 AFFIDAVIT of Edward Sheu in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss re #102 Response to Motion by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Contract Drafting and Review Manual excerpts 2014 Edition, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1 - Nancy Mansouri Deposition 8/7/14, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2 - Nancy Mansouri Deposition 8/7/14, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 1 - 8/28/14 Letter from Douglas Bahr, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 2 - 8/28/14 Letter from Douglas Bahr, #6 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Amended Answers to Interrogatories)(Sheu, Edward) (Attachment 6 replaced on 11/21/2014) (lh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2014: #7 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admissions) (lh). Modified on 11/21/2014 to separate Exhibits 4 and 5, and to add descriptions to attachments (lh).
November 19, 2014 Filing 103 AFFIDAVIT of Nancy Mansouri re: #102 Response to Motion by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - H2M Proposal for Public Information Coordinator 4/1/05, #2 Exhibit 2 , #3 Exhibit 3 Part 1 - 2011 Response for Proposal to ND Department of Transportation, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 2 - 2011 Response for Proposal to ND Department of Transportation)(Sheu, Edward) Modified on 11/21/2014 to add link and to add descriptions to attachments (lh).
November 19, 2014 Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by H2M, Inc.. (Sheu, Edward)
November 12, 2014 Filing 101 RESPONSE to Motion re 99 MOTION for Hearing re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by H2M, Inc.. (Sheu, Edward)
October 30, 2014 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #96 MOTION. Multiple relief motion filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed MOTION for Hearing at 99 . Clerk's office also added filers Spencer Grove, Dane Boedigheimer, and Annoying Orange, LLC. to the MOTION at #96 and MEMORANDUM at #97 . DOCKET CORRECTION re: #98 MEMORANDUM in Support. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as AFFIDAVIT at #100 . (as)
October 29, 2014 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey R. Cohen re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hanson's E-mail, 5/17/2010, #3 Exhibit 3 - Landa's Letter, dated 5/5/2011, #4 Exhibit 4 - Cohen's Letter, dated 5/27/2011, #5 Exhibit 5 - Simonsen's Deposition, #6 Exhibit 6 - Subpoena, #7 Exhibit 7 - Bahr's Letter, dated 8/28/2014, #8 Exhibit 8 - Cohen's Letter, dated 9/3/2014, #9 Exhibit 9 - Bahr's Letter, dated 10/10/2014, #10 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's Admission Response, #11 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiff's Admission Response, #12 Exhibit 12 - Hanson's Deposition)(as)
October 29, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION for Hearing re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Motion contained in Doc. #96 .) (as)
October 29, 2014 Filing 98 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) with Declaration of Jeffrey R. Cohen, filed by Annoying Orange, Inc., Spencer Grove, Dane Boedigheimer, Annoying Orange, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's documents, #2 Exhibit Hanson's email, #3 Exhibit Landa's letter, #4 Exhibit Cohen's letter, #5 Exhibit Simonsen's deposition, #6 Exhibit subpoena, #7 Exhibit Bahr's letter, #8 Exhibit Cohen's letter, #9 Exhibit Bahr's letter, #10 Exhibit Plaintiff's admission response, #11 Exhibit Plaintif's admission response, #12 Exhibit Hanson's deposition)(Culver, Michael) Modified on 10/30/2014 to add filers and restrict access. (as)
October 29, 2014 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Annoying Orange, Inc., Spencer Grove, Dane Boedigheimer, Annoying Orange, LLC (Culver, Michael) Modified on 10/30/2014 to add filers. (as)
October 29, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Annoying Orange, Inc., Spencer Grove, Dane Boedigheimer, Annoying Orange, LLC (Culver, Michael) Modified on 10/30/2014 to add filers. (as)
July 15, 2014 Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Early Settlement Conference held on 7/15/2014. (lh)
April 8, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of Hearing: Early Settlement Conference RESET for 7/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Fargo ADR Room before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 5/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in the Visiting Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal). (AS)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein adopting the #92 Stipulation regarding the #66 Scheduling Order filed by H2M, Inc. (Discovery due by 8/29/2014. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/29/2014. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/29/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 6/27/2014. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 10/30/2014.) (AS)
April 1, 2014 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #91 AMENDED DOCUMENT. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as STIPULATION at #92 . (as)
April 1, 2014 Filing 92 STIPULATION re #66 Scheduling Order, by H2M, Inc. (as)
April 1, 2014 Filing 91 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* AMENDED DOCUMENT by H2M, Inc.. Amendment to #66 Scheduling Order, . (Sheu, Edward) Modified on 4/1/2014 to restrict access. (as)
March 27, 2014 Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein: Status Conference held on 3/27/2014. (AS)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER LIFTING STAY by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. Status Conference set for 3/27/2014 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. The plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS) NEF regenerated to Attorney Edward Shue on 3/20/2014 (lf).
March 14, 2014 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #87 Notice of Appearance (Haggart, W.)
March 14, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Todd Haggart on behalf of H2M, Inc. (Haggart, W.)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 (Text Only) ORDER STAYING CASE by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. See written order at Doc. #85 . (AS)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein staying case, denying without prejudice #23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and granting #76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Barrett Landa terminated. (AS)
December 9, 2013 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #81 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office removed link to motion. (lc)
December 9, 2013 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #83 Reply to Response to Motion (Landa, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2013 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey Landa filed by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2013 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT of David Hanson (President and Chief Executive Officer of H2M, Inc.) re #76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey Landa by H2M, Inc. (lc)
December 4, 2013 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #80 Affidavit. (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/9/2013 to remove link. (lc)
December 4, 2013 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey Landa (#2) re #76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey Landa by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Haggart Email)(Landa, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2013 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #78 Affidavit,, #77 MEMORANDUM in Support, #76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey Landa (Landa, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2013 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey B. Landa re #77 MEMORANDUM in Support, #76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey Landa by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Text to Hanson, #2 Exhibit 2. Hanson email Landa Nov. 22, #3 Exhibit 3. Landa email Hanson Nov. 23, #4 Exhibit 4. Landa emails Hanson Nov. 23, #5 Exhibit 5. Landa/Hanson email string Nov. 26, #6 Exhibit 6. Landa text Hanson "Monday", #7 Exhibit 7. Landa/Hanson email string Nov. 26, #8 Exhibit 8. Landa texts Hanson, #9 Exhibit 9. Landa/Hanson email string Nov. 26, #10 Exhibit 10. Landa email Hanson Nov. 26, #11 Exhibit 11. Hanson email Landa Nov. 26, #12 Exhibit 12. Landa emails Hanson Nov. 27)(Landa, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2013 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support re #76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey Landa filed by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2013 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeffrey Landa by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. (AS)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein granting #73 Motion for Protective Order. (AS)
November 19, 2013 Filing 73 MOTION for Protective Order by Annoying Orange, Inc.. (Culver, Michael)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. Early Settlement Conference set for 5/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in the Visiting Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Response due by 2/3/2014. (AS)
October 2, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2015 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. Trial estimate is 10 days. (AS)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2015 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. (AS)
October 2, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/14/2014 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. The plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. Discovery due by 4/15/2014. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/16/2014. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/16/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2014. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 7/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2014. (AS)
October 1, 2013 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein: Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2013 re #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Annoying Orange, LLC, Spencer Grove, Annoying Orange, Inc., Dane Boedigheimer, Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2013. (DR #131001.000) (jo)
October 1, 2013 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #64 Corporate Disclosure Statement H2M, Inc. (Landa, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2013 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2013 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annoying Orange, Inc. re #62 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Culver, Michael)
September 30, 2013 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Annoying Orange, Inc.. (Culver, Michael)
September 11, 2013 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove re #60 Amended Answer to Complaint (Plambeck, Stephen)
September 11, 2013 Filing 60 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Plambeck, Stephen)
September 10, 2013 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove re #58 Answer to Complaint (Plambeck, Stephen)
September 10, 2013 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove.(Plambeck, Stephen)
August 22, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Hearing on #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (FRCP 56(d) Continuance in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment). Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2013 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. The hearing will be at the same time as the Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff is to initiate the call. The telephone number for Chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2013 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein. (AS) (Main Document 56 replaced on 8/22/2013 to correct the dispositive motion deadline on page 3. NEF Regenerated.) (as)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein granting #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (AS)
August 20, 2013 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #53 Reply to Response to Motion. Clerk's office linked to correct document. (rh)
August 19, 2013 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove re #53 Reply to Response to Motion (Plambeck, Stephen)
August 19, 2013 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Plambeck, Stephen) Modified on 8/20/2013 to link to correct document. (rh)
August 12, 2013 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #52 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office removed incorrect links. (lh)
August 11, 2013 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #51 Affidavit, #50 Response to Motion (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/12/2013 to remove incorrect links (lh).
August 11, 2013 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey B. Landa re #50 Response to Motion by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. NDDOT Copyright Registrations)(Landa, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2013 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2013 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #46 Motion to Continue. Wrong motion relief selected. Clerk's office corrected motion relief. Re: #47 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's office corrected motion relief in docket text. Re: #48 Affidavit. Clerk's office corrected motion relief in docket text. Re: #49 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office corrected motion relief in docket text. (rh)
July 30, 2013 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove re #47 MEMORANDUM in Support, #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply tinue FRCP 56(d) Continuance in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #48 Affidavit, (Plambeck, Stephen) Modified on 8/1/2013 to correct motion type. (rh)
July 30, 2013 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration) of Dane Boedigheimer re #47 MEMORANDUM in Support, #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply FRCP 56(d) Continuance in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Plambeck, Stephen) Modified on 8/1/2013 to correct motion type. (rh)
July 30, 2013 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support re #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply FRCP 56(d) Continuance in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Plambeck, Stephen) Modified on 8/1/2013 to correct motion type. (rh)
July 30, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment FRCP 56(d) Continuance in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Plambeck, Stephen) Modified on 8/1/2013 to correct motion type and add link. (rh)
July 26, 2013 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/30/2013: NOTE: Return was filed to specify name of defendant served on 7/16/13 (Dane Boedigheimer). (lc)
July 25, 2013 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and filer re-filed as Affidavit at #36 . Re: #25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and filer re-filed as Affidavit at #37 . Re: #26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and filer re-filed as Memorandum in Support at #35 . Re: #27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and filer re-filed as Affidavit at #38 . Re: #28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and filer re-filed as Affidavit at #40 . Re: #29 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office linked to corrected documents. (rh)
July 25, 2013 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H2M, Inc.. Dane Boedigheimer served on 7/16/2013, answer due 8/6/2013 (Landa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H2M, Inc.. Spencer Grove served on 6/10/2013, answer due 7/1/2013 (Landa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H2M, Inc.. Annoying Orange, Inc. served on 5/29/2013, answer due 6/19/2013 (Landa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H2M, Inc.. Annoying Orange, LLC served on 5/29/2013, answer due 6/19/2013 (Landa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #30 , #31 , #32 , #33 , & #34 Certificates of Service. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access. Filer directed to file documents using the correct event, Summons Returned Executed. (jt)
July 25, 2013 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Kim H. Simonsen re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1: 2005 Broadcast Order/Confirm, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2: 2006 Broadcast Order/Confirm, #3 Exhibit Exh. 3: 2007 Broadcast Order/Confirm (part 1), #4 Exhibit Exh. 4: 2007 Broadcast Order/Confirm (part 2), #5 Exhibit Exh. 5: 2008 Broadcast Order/Confirm, #6 Exhibit Exh. 6: 2009 Broadcast Order/Confirm, #7 Exhibit Exh. 7: 2010 Broadcast Order/Confirm, #8 Exhibit Exh. 8: 2005 Cable 1 Inv/Affidavits, #9 Exhibit Exh. 9: 2006 Cable 1 Inv/Affidavits, #10 Exhibit Exh. 10: 2007 Cable 1 Inv/Affidavits, #11 Exhibit Exh. 11: 2008 Cable 1 Inv/Affidavits, #12 Exhibit Exh. 12: 2009 Cable 1 Inv/Affidavits (part 1), #13 Exhibit Exh. 13: 2009 Cable 1 Inv/Affidavits (part 2), #14 Exhibit Exh. 14: 2010 Cable 1 Inv/Affidavits (part 1), #15 Exhibit Exh. 15: 2010 Cable 1 Inv/Affidavits (part 2), #16 Exhibit Exh. 16: 2007 TV Inv/Affidavits, #17 Exhibit Exh. 17: PSA Copy/Spot Instructions)(Landa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENT (Exhibit 8 - 9 Animations on DVD) to document: #38 Affidavit, by H2M, Inc. Pleading filed conventionally. (as)
July 25, 2013 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen Paul re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1: Paul c.v., #2 Exhibit Exh. 2: Cohen letter, #3 Exhibit Exh. 3: 2D comparison snapshots, #4 Exhibit Exh. 4: 2D Talking Orange PSA, #5 Exhibit Exh. 5: Talking Orange coloring book, #6 Exhibit Exh. 6: 2D Annoying Orange images, #7 Exhibit Exh. 7: Animation syllabus)(Landa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Ross Rolshoven re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1: Redacted Invest. Rpt., #2 Exhibit Exh. 2: Redacted Invest. Rpt.)(Landa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of David Hanson re #23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by H2M, Inc. (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/25/2013 to add link. (rh)
July 25, 2013 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by H2M, Inc.. (rh)
July 24, 2013 Filing 34 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Notice of Direct Assignment, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey Barrett Landa (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000368), #5 Register of Copyrights Notified to defendant Dane Boedigheimer (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/25/2013 to restrict access (jt).
July 24, 2013 Filing 33 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Notice of Direct Assignment, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey Barrett Landa (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000368), #5 Register of Copyrights Notified to Defendant Annoying Orange, Inc. (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/25/2013 to restrict access (jt).
July 24, 2013 Filing 32 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED*CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Notice of Direct Assignment, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey Barrett Landa (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000368), #5 Register of Copyrights Notified amended to defendant Annoying Orange, LLC (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/25/2013 to restrict access (jt).
July 24, 2013 Filing 31 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Notice of Direct Assignment, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey Barrett Landa (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000368), #5 Register of Copyrights Notified to defendant Spencer Grove (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/25/2013 to restrict access (jt).
July 24, 2013 Filing 30 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Notice of Direct Assignment, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey Barrett Landa (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000368), #5 Register of Copyrights Notified Annoying Orange, LLC (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/25/2013 to restrict access (jt).
July 23, 2013 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. re #23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #35 Memorandum in Support, #36 Affidavit, #37 Affidavit, #38 Affidavit, #39 Supplement, #40 Affidavit (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/25/2013 to link to corrected documents. (rh)
July 23, 2013 Filing 28 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Simonsen Affidavit by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2005 Broadcast Order/Confirms, #2 Exhibit 2006 Broadcast Order/Confirms, #3 Exhibit 2007 Broadcast Order/Confirms (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 2007 Broadcast Order/Confirms (Part 2), #5 Exhibit 2008 Broadcast Order/Confirms, #6 Exhibit 2009 Broadcast Order/Confirms, #7 Exhibit 2010 Broadcast Order/Confirms, #8 Exhibit 2005 Cable 1 Invoices/Affidavits, #9 Exhibit 2006 Cable 1 Invoices/Affidavits, #10 Exhibit 2007 Cable 1 Invoices/Affidavits, #11 Exhibit 2008 Cable 1 Invoices/Affidavits, #12 Exhibit 2009 Cable 1 Invoices/Affidavits (Part 1), #13 Exhibit 2009 Cable 1 Invoices/Affidavits (Part 2), #14 Exhibit 2010 Cable 1 Invoices/Affidabits (Part 1), #15 Exhibit 2010 Cable 1 Invoices/Affidavits (Part 2), #16 Exhibit 2007 TV Invoices/Affidavits, #17 Exhibit PSA Announcement Copy or Spot Instructions)(Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/24/2013 to restrict access. (rh)
July 23, 2013 Filing 27 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Paul Affidavit by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit resume, #2 Exhibit Cohen letter, #3 Exhibit 2D snapshots, #4 Exhibit 2D Talking Orange PSA, #5 Exhibit Talking Orange color book, #6 Exhibit 2D Annoying Orange images, #7 Exhibit Animation/Adv. Animation Outline)(Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/24/2013 to restrict access. (rh)
July 23, 2013 Filing 26 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Memoranum or Law by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/24/2013 to restrict access. (rh)
July 23, 2013 Filing 25 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rolshoven Affidavit by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Investigation #1, #2 Exhibit Investigation #2)(Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/24/2013 to restrict access. (rh)
July 23, 2013 Filing 24 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Hanson Affidavit by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/24/2013 to restrict access. (rh)
July 23, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2013 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H2M, Inc. (Landa, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2013 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2013 Filing 20 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (as)
June 18, 2013 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove re #18 MEMORANDUM in Support, #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plambeck, Stephen)
June 18, 2013 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Plambeck, Stephen)
June 18, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Annoying Orange, Inc., Annoying Orange, LLC, Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (Plambeck, Stephen)
June 17, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Spencer Grove. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/1/2013. (lf)
June 17, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dane Boedigheimer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/1/2013. (lf)
June 17, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Annoying Orange, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/1/2013. (lf)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Culver; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey R. Cohen; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam D. Mandell. (JJC)
June 14, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam D. Mandell (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000407) by Annoying Orange, Inc., Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (lf)
June 14, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey R. Cohen (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000407) by Annoying Orange, Inc., Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (lf)
June 14, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael Culver (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000407) by Annoying Orange, Inc., Dane Boedigheimer, Spencer Grove. (lf) (Main Document 10 replaced on 6/17/2013 to correct attorney name. NEF regenerated.) (lf)
June 10, 2013 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by H2M, Inc. (as)
June 10, 2013 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to H2M, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/17/2013. (lc)
June 5, 2013 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT service by publication re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by H2M, Inc.. (Landa, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen K. Klein granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey Barrett Landa. (JJC)
May 21, 2013 Filing 5 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Copyright. Form AO-121 mailed to register. (lc)
May 20, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey Barrett Landa (Filing fee $150, receipt number 313000368) by H2M, Inc. (lf)
May 20, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to H2M, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/3/2013. (as)
May 20, 2013 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Original mailed to Plaintiff with AO 398, AO 399) (as)
May 20, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 313000367) filed by H2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Certificate of Registrations, #2 Exhibit B - Trademark Search for Annoying Orange, #3 Exhibit C - Copyright Search for Annoying Orange)(as) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2013: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (as).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H2M, Inc. v. Boedigheimer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annoying Orange, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Cohen
Represented By: Adam D. Mandell
Represented By: Stephen W. Plambeck
Represented By: Michael Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Boedigheimer
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Cohen
Represented By: Adam D. Mandell
Represented By: Stephen W. Plambeck
Represented By: Michael Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annoying Orange, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Cohen
Represented By: Adam D. Mandell
Represented By: Stephen W. Plambeck
Represented By: Michael Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Grove
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Cohen
Represented By: Adam D. Mandell
Represented By: Stephen W. Plambeck
Represented By: Michael Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H2M, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Barrett Landa
Represented By: Edward P. Sheu
Represented By: W. Todd Haggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?