Grzeskowiak v. North Dakota
Plaintiff: Peter John Grzeskowiak
Defendant: North Dakota
Case Number: 3:2018cv00177
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT of Dismissal without prejudice. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff along with #8 Order.(lh)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. (kmk)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Peter John Grzeskowiak. NOTE: Case already reassigned. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(as)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #4 Complaint filed by Peter John Grzeskowiak be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2018). (AS)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (cc: plaintiff)(as)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against North Dakota (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Peter John Grzeskowiak. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint/Information, #2 Documents filed with Supreme Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Peter John Grzeskowiak. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/7/2018. (as)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter John Grzeskowiak. (Attachments: #1 Additional page for IFP, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Amended Felony Complaint/Information, #4 Notice of Consent, #5 Docs filed with Supreme Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Mailing Envelope)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grzeskowiak v. North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter John Grzeskowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?