Mortgage Company, Inc., The v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602 et al

Plaintiff: Mortgage Company, Inc., The
Defendant: Bond Number SUA 5838-1602 and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602
Case Number: 3:2018cv00179
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 9 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendants' answer due by 11/3/2018. (AS)
September 27, 2018 8 STIPULATION by Bond Number SUA 5838-1602, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602. (Edison, Brent)
September 26, 2018 7 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stefan R. Dandelles. (AS) NEF Regenerated to PHV attorney Stefan R. Dandelles. (as)
September 25, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stefan R. Dandelles (Filing fee $150, receipt number 318000553) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602. (as)
September 19, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bond Number SUA 5838-1602, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602 re #4 Notice of Appearance (Edison, Brent)
September 19, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent J. Edison on behalf of All Defendants (Edison, Brent)
September 17, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mortgage Company, Inc., The. All Defendants (Knoll, Ronald)
September 4, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Bond Number SUA 5838-1602, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602. (as)
September 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bond Number SUA 5838-1602, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 318000518) filed by Mortgage Company, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortgage Company, Inc., The v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortgage Company, Inc., The
Represented By: Ronald J. Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bond Number SUA 5838-1602
Represented By: Brent J. Edison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number SUA 13730-1602
Represented By: Stefan R. Dandelles
Represented By: Brent J. Edison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?