Hamilton v. United Accounts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alice Hamilton
Defendant: United Accounts, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00180
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (lh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 (Text Only) NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 2/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (Trial est. 2-3 days) Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (CS) Modified on 10/31/2018 to add 'text only' language and days of trial estimate - NEF Regenerated. (js)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2018. (lc)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call to chambers at 701-297-7070. (CS) Modified on 10/31/2018 to add call in information. NEF Regenerated. (as)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 5/15/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 4/1/2019. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 4/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2018. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 5/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2019. (CS)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Alice Hamilton. (js)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to United Accounts, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/11/2018. (rh)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Accounts, Inc.. (Morris, Christopher)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United Accounts, Inc..(Morris, Christopher)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Alice Hamilton. (as)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Alice Hamilton. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/19/2018. (js)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United Accounts, Inc. (js)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Accounts, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 318000520) filed by Alice Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. United Accounts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Hamilton
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Accounts, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?