Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Nathan

Plaintiff: Midland National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeffrey Nathan
Case Number: 3:2018cv00184
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 13 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
November 5, 2018 12 STIPULATION for Judgment and Proposed Order for Judgment of Rescission and Dismissal with Prejudice by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Strand, Scott)
October 1, 2018 11 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Midland National Life Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/9/2018. (as)
September 27, 2018 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for Midland National Life Insurance Company.. (Strand, Scott)
September 24, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Jeffrey Nathan served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018 (Strand, Scott)
September 17, 2018 8 Featured Case (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel C.W. Narvey; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew S. Oettinger. (AS) Modified on 9/17/2018 NEF regenerated to attorneys Narvey and Oettinger (lh).
September 14, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Oettinger (Filing fee $150, receipt number 318000535) by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (as)
September 14, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel C.W. Narvey (Filing fee $150, receipt number 318000534) by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (as)
September 12, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #4 Motion to Deposit Funds. (AS)
September 11, 2018 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds with the Court by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Strand, Scott)
September 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Nathan. (js)
September 11, 2018 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Midland National Life Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/25/2018. (js)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Rescission against Jeffrey Nathan (Filing fee $400, receipt number 318000526) filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Life Insurance Policy (No. 1771), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midland National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott M. Strand
Represented By: Andrew S. Oettinger
Represented By: Daniel C.W. Narvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?