Central Plains Ag Services LLC v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Central Plains Ag Services LLC
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00200
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 2/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (Trial Est. 3 Days). (AS)
November 20, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
November 20, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
November 20, 2018 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
November 20, 2018 5 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 7/11/2019. Discovery Motions due by 7/31/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/8/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/9/2019. Expert Discovery due by 10/14/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2018. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 1/15/2019. Threshold Motions due by 1/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/12/2019. (AS)
November 16, 2018 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 11/16/2018. (lc)
October 12, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
October 11, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Wetch, Joseph)
October 4, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company from Griggs County District Court, case number not assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000010 filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit with Complaint and Summons filed in Griggs County District Court, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Plains Ag Services LLC v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph A. Wetch, Jr.
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Plains Ag Services LLC
Represented By: Steven Francis Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?