Reliance Leasing Inc. et al v. GMI Insurance et al

Plaintiff: Reliance Leasing Inc., Reliance Rentals LLC and Reliance Aviation
Defendant: National Interstate Insurance Company and GMI Insurance
Case Number: 3:2018cv00205
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 12/6/2018. Case has settled. (lc)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Per discussion at the 12/6/2018 Scheduling Conference, the parties advised the court they have reached a settlement. Closing documents due by 1/7/2019. (CS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reliance Aviation, Reliance Leasing Inc., Reliance Rentals LLC. (McCamy, Ryan)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Interstate Insurance Company. (Wolf, Troy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by National Interstate Insurance Company. (Wolf, Troy)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GMI Insurance. (Evenson, Thomas)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (js)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Reliance Aviation, Reliance Leasing Inc., and Reliance Rentals LLC. (js)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Reliance Rentals LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/30/2018. (js)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Reliance Leasing Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/30/2018. (js)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Reliance Aviation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/30/2018. (js)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to GMI Insurance. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/30/2018. (js)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GMI Insurance from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2018-CV-03394. Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000028 filed by GMI Insurance.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Thomas J. Evenson, #3 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Answer, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reliance Leasing Inc. et al v. GMI Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reliance Leasing Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. McCamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reliance Rentals LLC
Represented By: Ryan C. McCamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reliance Aviation
Represented By: Ryan C. McCamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Interstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Tyler S. Carlson
Represented By: Troy A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMI Insurance
Represented By: Brian A. Wood
Represented By: Thomas J. Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?