Larson et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Plaintiff: Sherry Larson and James Larson
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00218
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (5 days) (CS) Modified on 12/21/2018 to add # of days of trial - NEF Regenerated. (js)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
December 21, 2018 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call into chambers at (701) 297-7070. (CS)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 5/31/2019. Discovery Motions due by 6/15/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/28/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/26/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 8/12/2019. Expert Discovery due by 9/12/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 6/15/2019. Threshold Motions due by 1/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2019.(CS) Modified on 12/21/2018 to correct joinder, amended pleadings, and threshold motion deadlines - NEF Regenerated. (js)
December 21, 2018 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 12/21/2018. (lc)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
November 21, 2018 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Miller, Lee)
October 29, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (as)
October 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000042) filed by Sherry Larson, James Larson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Larson
Represented By: Paula M. Jossart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Larson
Represented By: Paula M. Jossart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Lee A. Miller
Represented By: Emily Ann Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?