Cvijanovich v. United States Secret Service

Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Cvijanovich
Defendant: United States Secret Service
Case Number: 3:2018cv00220
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying #11 Motion to Stay. (CS)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay re #10 Order,, Set Hearings, Discovery, and set Dispositive Motion Deadlines by United States Secret Service. (Thomas, James)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Defendant's counsel shall initiate the call into chambers at 701-297-7070. (CS)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by United States Secret Service. (lh)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to United States Secret Service. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/18/2018. (js)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Secret Service.(Thomas, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Thomas on behalf of United States Secret Service (Thomas, James)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Secret Service served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (as)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Daniel Edward Cvijanovich. (as)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Daniel Edward Cvijanovich. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/13/2018. (as)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Secret Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (as)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Secret Service (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000043) filed by Daniel Edward Cvijanovich. (Attachments: #1 List of Attachments, #2 Letter from Daniel Cvijanovich dated December 1, 2017, #3 Letter from Kim E. Campbell, SAIC, dated April 9, 2018, #4 Letter from Daniel Svijanovich dated June 2, 2018, #5 Letter from Deputy Director William J. Callahan dated July 31, 2018, #6 Affidavit of Daniel Cvijanovich, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cvijanovich v. United States Secret Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Cvijanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Secret Service
Represented By: James P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?