Maple Valley Ag Chemical, Inc. et al v. Stringer et al
Plaintiff: Maple Valley Ag Products, LLC, Maple Valley Oil Assn. Coop, Maple Valley Ag Chemical, Inc. and Pak Ag, Inc.
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Phyllis Otterness, North Dakota State Tax Commissioner, Killoran Partnership, Charlene Stringer, All persons unknown, claiming an estate or interest in, or lien or encumbrance upon, the real estate described in the Complaint, Durward Otterness and Richard Stringer
Case Number: 3:2018cv00229
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 All future pleadings shall be filed in Lead Case No. 3:15-cv-108. (as)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #3 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (CS)
December 18, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Response to Motion. Clerk's office added exhibit numbers to attachments and added filers (Maple Valley Ag Products, LLC, Maple Valley Oil Assn. Coop, Pak Ag, Inc.). (rh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Maple Valley Ag Chemical, Inc., Maple Valley Ag Products, LLC, Maple Valley Oil Assn. Coop, Pak Ag, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Register of Actions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint)(Teigland, James) Modified on 12/18/2018 to add exhibit numbers and add filers (Maple Valley Ag Products, LLC, Maple Valley Oil Assn. Coop, Pak Ag, Inc). (rh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charlene Stringer, Richard Stringer re #8 Affidavit, #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Cook, Andrew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew D. Cook re #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charlene Stringer, Richard Stringer. (Cook, Andrew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charlene Stringer, Richard Stringer. (Cook, Andrew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brayden Harwood on behalf of Durward Otterness, Phyllis Otterness (Harwood, Brayden)
December 11, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Notice of Appearance. Clerk's office added filer (Phyllis Otterness). (rh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Williams on behalf of Durward Otterness, Phyllis Otterness (Williams, Benjamin) Modified on 12/11/2018 to add filer (Phyllis Otterness). (rh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by North Dakota State Tax Commissioner. (Dendy, Charles)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Internal Revenue Service. (Pahl, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Killoran Partnership ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Killoran Partnership. (Manly, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Internal Revenue Service from Barnes County District Court, case number 02-2018-cv-279. Filing fee: WAIVED filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit B - Promissory Note, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Admission of Service on Durward and Phyllis Otterness, #7 Admission of Service on Killoran Partnership, #8 Notification of Assignment and Case Number, #9 Affidavit of James Teigland, #10 Answer, Counterclaim and Jury Demand of Durward Otterness and Phyllis Otterness, #11 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maple Valley Ag Chemical, Inc. et al v. Stringer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Michael R. Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Otterness
Represented By: Benjamin J. Williams
Represented By: Brayden Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota State Tax Commissioner
Represented By: Charles L. Dendy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Killoran Partnership
Represented By: Robert G. Manly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Stringer
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All persons unknown, claiming an estate or interest in, or lien or encumbrance upon, the real estate described in the Complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durward Otterness
Represented By: Benjamin J. Williams
Represented By: Brayden Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stringer
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maple Valley Ag Products, LLC
Represented By: James Arthur Teigland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maple Valley Oil Assn. Coop
Represented By: James Arthur Teigland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maple Valley Ag Chemical, Inc.
Represented By: James Arthur Teigland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pak Ag, Inc.
Represented By: James Arthur Teigland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?