Iverson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Richard Iverson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv00233
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #9 Motion to Stay Case until restoration of appropriations. (AS)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Action Due to Lapse of Appropriations by Social Security Administration. (Burkland, Melissa)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (lh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Burkland, Melissa)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Richard Iverson. (as)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Richard Iverson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/30/2018. (js)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (js)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Richard Iverson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Iverson. (Attachments: #1 proposed Complaint and JS44)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iverson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Iverson
Represented By: Scott A. Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?