Campbell Property Management, LLC v. Hiscox, Inc.

Plaintiff: Campbell Property Management, LLC
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00237
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hiscox, Inc.. (Strand, Scott)
December 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Replies due by 1/7/2019. (as)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting #5 Stipulation filed by Hiscox, Inc. and #6 Stipulation filed by Hiscox, Inc. Defendant shall file a reply brief by 1/7/2019. Rule 16(b) scheduling order and Rule 26(f) conference stayed pending decision on motion to dismiss. (CS)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Stay Rule 26(f) Report and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order by Hiscox, Inc.. (Strand, Scott)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Reply Brief by Hiscox, Inc.. (Strand, Scott)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Campbell Property Management, LLC. (McLean, Ronald)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hiscox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Campbell Letter to Hiscox 2-7-18, #2 Exhibit B - Serkland letter with 54 Notices of Claim)(Strand, Scott)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hiscox, Inc.. (Strand, Scott)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hiscox, Inc. from Cass County District Court, case number not assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000070 filed by Hiscox, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Helen Weinstein, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell Property Management, LLC v. Hiscox, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Strand
Represented By: Brandon Gossett
Represented By: Scott F. Bertschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campbell Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Kasey D. McNary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?