Highshaw v. Altru Health System
Plaintiff: Ralph Highshaw
Defendant: Altru Health System
Case Number: 3:2018cv00240
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings.(as)
December 31, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Altru Health System. (as)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Altru Health System. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/2/2019. (as)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Altru Health System.(Larkin, Patrick)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ralph Highshaw. (js)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Highshaw. Altru Health System served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018 (Adams, Jerri)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jerri Adams. (am)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher D. Jozwiak. (am)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jerri Adams (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000228) by Ralph Highshaw. (Adams, Jerri) Modified on 11/21/2018 to add receipt number (am).
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher D. Jozwiak (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000227) by Ralph Highshaw. (Jozwiak, Christopher) Modified on 11/21/2018 to add receipt number (am).
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ralph Highshaw. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/4/2018. (lh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Altru Health System. (lh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altru Health System (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000072) filed by Ralph Highshaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highshaw v. Altru Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Highshaw
Represented By: Jerri Carmelita Adams
Represented By: Benjamin E. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D Jozwiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altru Health System
Represented By: Patrick James Larkin
Represented By: Brian A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?