Martinez v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Elisa Martinez
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv00250
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: North Dakota District Court
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Summons Returned Executed. Clerk's office corrected docket text as to the party served. (lh)
December 21, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elisa Martinez. Social Security Administration served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Schneider, McLain) Modified on 12/27/2018 to correct party served (lh).
December 7, 2018 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (lh)
December 6, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Burkland, Melissa)
December 3, 2018 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Elisa Martinez. (js)
December 3, 2018 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Elisa Martinez. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/17/2018. (js)
December 3, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (js)
December 3, 2018 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Elisa Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (CS)
November 30, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elisa Martinez. (Attachments: #1 proposed Complaint and JS44)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Martinez
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?