Kelsh v. Fargo, City of
Plaintiff: Scot Kelsh
Defendant: Fargo, City of
Case Number: 3:2018cv00269
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #9 Motion to Continue. Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference RESET for 3/20/2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 2/20/2019 at 9:00 AM). (CS)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Scot Kelsh. (as)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fargo, City of.(Swanson, Howard)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued filed by Scot Kelsh. Fargo, City of served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (as)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Scot Kelsh. (as)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Scot Kelsh. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/4/2019. (lh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fargo, City of. (lh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fargo, City of (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000114) filed by Scot Kelsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelsh v. Fargo, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scot Kelsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo, City of
Represented By: Howard D. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?