Heritage Homes, LLC v. Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Heritage Homes, LLC
Defendant: Benjamin R. Anderson, Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC and Benjamin Anderson Custom Homes
Case Number: 3:2018cv00271
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
0 Judge: Daniel L Hovland
1 Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Jason L. Gilbert re #13 MEMORANDUM in Support by Benjamin R. Anderson, Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from Design Basics)(Neustel, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Benjamin R. Anderson, Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC. (Neustel, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Benjamin R. Anderson, Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC. (Neustel, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #10 Stipulation filed by Benjamin R. Anderson, Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC. Defendants' answer due 2/21/2019. (AS)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Benjamin R. Anderson, Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC. (Neustel, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Neustel on behalf of All Defendants (Neustel, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heritage Homes, LLC. Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019 (McCamy, Ryan)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heritage Homes, LLC. Benjamin R. Anderson served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019 (McCamy, Ryan)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (js)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Heritage Homes, LLC. (js)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 AO-121 Form mailed to Register of Copyrights. (as)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Heritage Homes, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/14/2019. (as)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Benjamin R. Anderson, Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC. (as)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benjamin R. Anderson, Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000118) filed by Heritage Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Georgetown, #2 Exhibit 2 - CR and Deposit - Georgetown, #3 Exhibit 3 - CR and Deposit - Georgetown III, #4 Exhibit 4 - 805 11th Ave - Vogel Contract, #5 Exhibit 5 - Georgetown 3 - Garage left for Vogels, #6 Exhibit 6 - Vogel Contract Termination, #7 Exhibit 7 - 535 11th Ave Infringing Photos, #8 Exhibit 8 - Infringing Construction Drawings, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2333 Harbor Lane Infringement, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heritage Homes, LLC v. Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Homes, LLC
Represented By: Ryan C. McCamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin R. Anderson
Represented By: Michael S. Neustel
Represented By: Chad E. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Custom Homes, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Neustel
Represented By: Chad E. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Anderson Custom Homes
Represented By: Michael S. Neustel
Represented By: Chad E. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?