Loberg v. Caterpillar Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Loberg
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc. and Caterpillar Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00012
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
2 Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Status Conference held on 10/20/2020. (DR #201020-000 JS Chambers Recorder) (lc)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Per discussion at the October 20, 2020 status conference, the #85 Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 3/15/2021. Discovery due by 2/28/2021. Discovery Motions due by 3/15/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 6/25/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/15/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2015. Nondispositive Motions due by 2/28/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 6/10/2021). See written instructions at Doc. #18 . Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, and Jury Trial RESET for 11/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Previously set for 6/22/2021). (Trial Est. 4-5 Days). (AKS)
October 16, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070.(AKS)
September 14, 2020 Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Settlement Conference held on 9/14/2020. Case did not settle. (Attachments: #1 Attendance Sheet). (AS)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 01:00 PM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
August 6, 2020 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Settlement Conference held on 8/6/2020. Case did not settle. (Attachments: #1 Attendance Sheet). (AS) Modified on 8/10/2020 to correct hearing date. NEF regenerated (lf).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The Clerk is directed to amend the caption as to defendant's name, Caterpillar Inc., rather than Caterpillar, Inc. (AS)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. See written instructions at Doc. #18 . (LF)
July 13, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial est. 4-5 days). (LF)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The Scheduling Orders at Doc. #16 , 38 , and 41 are amended as follows. Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Discovery Motions due by 11/9/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/20/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Reports due by 12/11/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/31/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Reports due by 1/21/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 2/25/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 11/16/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 10/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/29/2020. (LF)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Status Conference held on 6/12/2020. (DR #200612-000) (as)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The final pretrial conference set for June 30, 2020, and the pretrial conference and jury trial set for July 14, 2020, are continued to dates to be determined. (AS)
June 8, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew D. Parker. (pb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew D. Parker (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1965466) by Brian Loberg. (Parker, Andrew) Modified to add receipt number on 6/8/2020 (pb).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jordon C. Greenlee. (rh)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori A. Johnson. (rh)
June 5, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Johnson on behalf of Brian Loberg (Johnson, Lori)
June 5, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jordon C. Greenlee (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1965269) by Brian Loberg. (Greenlee, Jordon) Modified on 6/8/2020 to add receipt number. (rh)
June 5, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lori A. Johnson (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1965266) by Brian Loberg. (Johnson, Lori) Modified on 6/8/2020 to add receipt number. (rh)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (LF) Distributed on 6/1/2020 (cjs).
May 15, 2020 Filing 71 SEALED DOCUMENT re #70 Order. (as)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) Distributed on 5/15/2020 (as).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER for mediation by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Attachments: #1 Request for Limited Appointment of Counsel). (LF) Distributed on 5/4/2020 (as).
February 20, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE re: attempts to obtain counsel by Brian Loberg (Attachments: #1 E-mails)(as)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal holding in abeyance the #43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for thirty days. Discovery will remain stayed and deadlines will remain suspended until the court has ruled on the motion. (AS)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery is stayed and deadlines are suspended until the court has ruled on the #43 Motion to Withdraw. (CS)
December 11, 2019 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Status Conference held on 12/11/2019. (DR #191211-000 JS Chambers Recorder) (lc)
December 9, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #46 AFFIDAVIT. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE at #48 and linked to documents that were served upon party. (js)
December 6, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian Loberg re #43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, and #44 MEMORANDUM in Support. (js)
December 6, 2019 Filing 46 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* AFFIDAVIT of Service by Brian Loberg. (Crain, Amanda) Modified on 12/9/2019 to restrict access. (js)
November 27, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support re #43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Without Substitution filed by Brian Loberg. (Attachments: #1 L.R. 7.1(F) and (H) Word Count Certificate)(Crain, Amanda) Modified on 12/2/2019 to remove reference to 'Exhibit'. (rh)
November 27, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Without Substitution by Brian Loberg. (Crain, Amanda)
October 7, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call into chambers at (701) 297-7070. (CS)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #39 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct. Per the parties' joint motion, the #16 Scheduling Order and 38 Amended Scheduling Order are amended as follows: Discovery due by 2/18/2020; Discovery Motions due by 2/28/2020; Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/25/2020; Plaintiff Expert Witness Reports due by 3/10/2020; Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/24/2020; Defendant Expert Witness Reports due by 4/7/2020; Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 5/12/2020; Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 2/18/2020; Nondispositive Motions due by 2/18/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2020. The trial date remains 7/14/2020. (CS)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #39 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct. (CS)
October 4, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Amend/Correct 38 Order,,,, Set Deadlines,,,, Terminate Motions,,, Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling / Discovery Plan Order by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Scheduling / Discovery Plan Order)(Smentek, Sharilee)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (Text Only) ORDER granting #37 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Caterpillar, Inc. by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Per the parties' joint motion, the #16 Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Amend Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 11/20/2019; Discovery due by 11/20/2019; Discovery Motions due by 12/2/2019; Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 2/13/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/27/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 12/11/2019; Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/26/2019; Defendant's Expert Reports due by 1/9/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020; Nondispositive Motions due by 11/20/2019. The parties shall evaluate the case for settlement purposes by 12/2/2019. (CS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 Scheduling Order,, Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling / Discovery Plan Order. by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Scheduling / Discovery Plan Order)(Smentek, Sharilee)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal finding as moot #33 Motion for Protective Order. (CS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation for a Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Protective Order by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Smentek, Sharilee)
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 7/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Peter D. Welte (4-5 days). (change as to judge only) (kmk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Peter D. Welte. (change as to judge only)(kmk)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda R. Crain on behalf of Brian Loberg (Crain, Amanda)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sharilee K. Smentek. (lh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sharilee K. Smentek (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000371) by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Smentek, Sharilee) Modified on 6/19/2019 to add receipt number (lh).
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 6/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (change in time only; previously set for 6/30/20 at 10:00 AM)(lh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Mid-Discovery Status Conference held on 6/11/2019. (lc)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Per agreement of counsel at the 6/11/2019 status conference, the Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 6/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal (see instructions at Doc. #18 ) (previously set for 05/05/2020), the Pretrial Conference is RESET for 7/14/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland, and the Jury Trial is RESET for 7/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (previously set for 5/19/2020). (CS)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Colton D. Long terminated. (CS)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Colton Long by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Turner, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine F. Mendez. (lh)
June 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Katherine F. Mendez (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000350) by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Mendez, Katherine) Modified on 6/6/2019 to add receipt number (lh).
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (Trial Est. 4-5 Days). (AS)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 9/20/2019. Discovery Motions due by 10/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/27/2019 and Reports due by 10/11/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/25/2019 and Reports due by 11/8/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 9/20/2019. Threshold Motions due by 4/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2019. (AS)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 3/15/2019. (lc)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings.(js) Modified on 2/28/2019 to remove inadvertently attached document - docket entry is 'text only' - NEF Regenerated. (js)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Caterpillar, Inc. (js)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 3/15/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 3/14/2019 at 10:30 AM). See written instructions at Doc. #10 . (AS)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Caterpillar, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/22/2019. (as)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Caterpillar, Inc... (Turner, Joseph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Caterpillar, Inc..(Turner, Joseph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Turner on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Turner, Joseph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Colton D. Long on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Long, Colton)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Brian Loberg. (lh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Loberg. Caterpillar, Inc. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019 (Denny, Emma)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Brian Loberg. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/29/2019. (as)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Caterpillar, Inc. (as)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caterpillar, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000139) filed by Brian Loberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loberg v. Caterpillar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Colton D. Long
Represented By: Joseph S. Turner
Represented By: Sharilee Smentek
Represented By: Katherine Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Sharilee Smentek
Represented By: Joseph S. Turner
Represented By: Katherine Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Loberg
Represented By: Christopher J. Moreland
Represented By: Emma Reece Denny
Represented By: Sean T. Foss
Represented By: Jordon Greenlee
Represented By: Lori Johnson
Represented By: Amanda R. Crain
Represented By: Andrew D. Parker
Represented By: Stephen Welle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?