Carter v. Bobcat Company et al

Plaintiff: Terry Carter
Defendant: Lyn Lamb, Mike Peterson, John Ness, Bobcat Company, Ryan Lukes, Travis Swanson, Wade Urbach, Erica German, Todd Sagvold, Ky Titus, Jorge Vazquez, Doug Anderson and Greg Huus
Case Number: 3:2019cv00015
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (js)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. See written Order at Doc. #7 . (AS)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #5 Complaint filed by Terry Carter be dismissed and ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying the 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Terry Carter. (Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2019). (AS)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Terry Carter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/11/2019. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Doug Anderson, Bobcat Company, Erica German, Lyn Lamb, Ryan Lukes, John Ness, Mike Peterson, Todd Sagvold, Travis Swanson, Ky Titus, Wade Urbach, Jorge Vazquez (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Terry Carter.(Attachments: #1 Charge of Discrimination, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Terry Carter. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/1/2019. (js)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 (Text Only) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Terry Carter. See attachment 1 to docket entry 1, proposed complaint, page 9 of 13. (js)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terry Carter. (Attachments: #1 proposed Complaint, #2 Mailing Envelope)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Bobcat Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyn Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobcat Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Urbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Sagvold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ky Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Huus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?