Britton v. Ruby Tuesday

Plaintiff: Coozie Britton, Jr.
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday
Case Number: 3:2019cv00018
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ruby Tuesday. (lh)
March 11, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Motion to Dismiss. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed Motion for Summary Judgment at 15 . Re: #11 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's office added link to 15 . Re: #12 Affidavit. Clerk's office added link to 15 and removed excess text. Re: #13 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office added link to 15 . (rh)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ruby Tuesday. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2019. (js)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ruby Tuesday. See Document #10 . (rh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ruby Tuesday re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, 15 Motion for Summary Judgment, #12 Affidavit,, #11 MEMORANDUM in Support Certificate of Service on Plaintiff Coozie Britton (Lystad, Vanessa) Modified on 3/11/2019 to add link to document 15 . (rh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Todd Hoekstra re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, 15 Motion for Summary Judgment by Ruby Tuesday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ND Secretary of State Certificate of Trade Name Registry, #2 Exhibit B - Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Coozie Britton Paycheck, #4 Exhibit D - Redacted copies of Coozie Britton's 2014 and 2015 W-2's, #5 Exhibit E - Response to ND Department of Labor and Human Rights)(Lystad, Vanessa) Modified on 3/11/2019 to remove excess text and add link to document 15 . (rh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ruby Tuesday. (Lystad, Vanessa) Modified on 3/11/2019 to add link to document 15 . (rh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Ruby Tuesday. (Lystad, Vanessa)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Coozie Britton, Jr. (Note: this document was provided to the Court by Mr. Britton to show that it was provided to the defendants upon serving them with the Summons and Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (js)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coozie Britton, Jr. Ruby Tuesday served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(lh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT (Page 6 and 7 of Enclosure 1) to document: #1 Complaint, by Coozie Britton, Jr. NOTE: Document pages are the same as page 6 and 7 in the Supplement (Complete version of Enclosure 1) filed at Document #4 . (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(as)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Coozie Britton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(lh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Coozie Britton, Jr. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/11/2019. (lh) Modified on 2/4/2019 to restrict access; Consent/Reassignment Form received on today's date after this entry was made; Second Notice was not mailed to pro se Plaintiff (lh).
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT (Complete version of Enclosure 1) to document: #1 Complaint, by Coozie Britton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(as)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Coozie Britton, Jr. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/31/2019. (as)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ruby Tuesday. (as)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000142) filed by Coozie Britton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure 1 - Claim, #2 Enclosure 2- EEOC Claim, #3 Enclosure 3 - Statement from Daryn Skjefte, #4 Enclosure 4 - Article re: Col. Happel, #5 Mailing Envelope)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britton v. Ruby Tuesday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coozie Britton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday
Represented By: Vanessa L. Lystad
Represented By: Lisa K. Edison-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?