Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. v. Coborn's Incorporated

Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.
Defendant: Coborn's Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00026
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Coborn's Incorporated. (as)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/15/2019. (lh)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Coborn's Incorporated. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/22/2019. (cjs)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Coborn's Incorporated.(Kostolnik, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/11/2019. (js)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coborn's Incorporated. (js)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 AO-121 Form mailed to Register of Copyrights. (js)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coborn's Incorporated (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000153) filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photograph of Copyrighted Image, #2 Exhibit B - Website screenshot of Coborn's add, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc. v. Coborn's Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coborn's Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew P. Kostolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?