Schaar v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Schaar
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Chase Auto, Trans Union, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Corporate Services, Westlake Services, LLC and Johnson & Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00031
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kurt M. Gosselin. (am)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kurt M. Gosselin (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000734) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Gosselin, Kurt) Modified on 3/25/2019 to add receipt number (am).
March 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin P Hoffman on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Hoffman, Calvin)
March 18, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed in Error. Clerk's office restricted access to document. (am)
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 *RESTRICTED-FILED IN ERROR* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hogue, David) Modified on 3/18/2019 to restrict access (am).
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnson & Associates, P.C. re #15 Notice of Appearance (Winters Zotto, Shelby)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelby Winters Winters Zotto on behalf of Johnson & Associates, P.C. (Winters Zotto, Shelby)
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase Bank USA, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for Chase Bank USA, N.A... (Court, Benjamin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chase Bank USA, N.A..(Court, Benjamin)
February 28, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: Order at #12. Clerk's office added link to the Stipulation at #11 . (lh)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting #11 Stipulation by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Chase Bank USA, N.A. answer due by 3/14/2019. (CS) Modified on 2/28/2019 to add link (lh).
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extention until 3/14/19 to move, answer, or otherwise respond by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Court, Benjamin)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting #8 Stipulation by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 4/15/2019. (CS)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Brady, Scott)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hogue, David)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnson & Associates, P.C. re #5 Answer to Complaint, #6 Notice of Appearance (Johnson, Ward)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ward K. Johnson, III on behalf of Johnson & Associates, P.C. (Johnson, Ward)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Associates, P.C..(Johnson, Ward)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Brady, Scott) Modified on 2/13/2019 to correct corporate parent information. NEF regenerated (am).
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Brady on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Brady, Scott)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank USA, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Johnson & Associates, P.C., Trans Union, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC. (as)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chase Bank USA, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Johnson & Associates, P.C., Trans Union, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000163) filed by Katherine Schaar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaar v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Court
Represented By: Calvin P Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt M Gosselin
Represented By: David J. Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Auto
Represented By: Benjamin J. Court
Represented By: Calvin P Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Corporate Services
Represented By: Benjamin J. Court
Represented By: Calvin P Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Ward K. Johnson, III
Represented By: Shelby Winters Zotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Schaar
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?