Baem v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patrice Baem
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00038
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (as)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Social Security Administration (Burkland, Melissa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Patrice Baem. (js)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Patrice Baem. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/7/2019. (as)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (as) Modified on 2/22/2019 to add U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General to the docket text. NEF regenerated. (lf)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000187) filed by Patrice Baem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baem v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Baem
Represented By: Scott A. Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?