Harleysville Insurance Company v. Choice Financial Group

Plaintiff: Harleysville Insurance Company
Defendant: Choice Financial Group
Case Number: 3:2019cv00043
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (js)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland adopting #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Harleysville Insurance Company. (NH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 (Text Only) by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. In light of the #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the Status Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 09:30 AM is CANCELLED. (AS)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Harleysville Insurance Company (Dunford, Thomas)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Obermueller on behalf of Choice Financial Group (Obermueller, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Dunford on behalf of Harleysville Insurance Company (Dunford, Thomas)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (lh)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Harleysville Insurance Company. (lh)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Harleysville Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/27/2019. (js)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harleysville Insurance Company. Choice Financial Group served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019 (Wetch, Joseph)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Harleysville Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/12/2019. (as)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Choice Financial Group. (as)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Choice Financial Group (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000194) filed by Harleysville Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Insurance Company v. Choice Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph A. Wetch, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Dunford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Financial Group
Represented By: Michael E. Obermueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?