Nuevos Destinos, LLC et al v. Peck et al
Plaintiff: William P Cook, Nuevos Destinos Peru, S.A.C. and Nuevos Destinos, LLC
Defendant: Giuliana Pasquale, Marysol Salazar, Javier Rodriguez Larra Salinas, Javier Urteaga, Antonio Salazar Salazar, Agricola Peruana Del Sol, S.R.L., Nilton Palacios Pozo, Jorge Emilio Harten Rodrigue Larrain, Gonzalo Rodriguez Larra De Lavalle, Ofelia Maria Rodriguez Larra De Harten, Ignacio Harten Rodrigue Larrain, Jorge Harten Costa, Peruvian Organic International Trading S.A.C., Convalor S.A.C., Manuel Viduarre, Felipe Bedregal, Samuel Peck, Emilio Farah, Confactor S.A.C., C&V Exports, S.A.C. and SKE Midwestern, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00045
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #120 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Modified entry to add filers Nuevos Destinos Peru, S.A.C. and William P Cook. (am)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #120 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bruce H. Weitzman. (as)
April 4, 2019 Filing 120 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bruce H. Weitzman (Filing fee $150, receipt number 319000255) by Nuevos Destinos, LLC., Nuevos Destinos Peru, S.A.C, and William P Cook (Weitzman, Bruce) Modified on 4/5/2019 to add receipt number and add additional filers. (as)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #118 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hunter T. Carter. (cjs)
March 25, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Hunter T. Carter (Filing fee $150, receipt number 119000737) by Convalor S.A.C., Emilio Farah. (Carter, Hunter) (Main Document 118 replaced on 3/25/2019 in a non-fillable pdf format) (cjs). Regenerated on 3/25/2019 (cjs).
March 11, 2019 Filing 117 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (attorney admission letter). Mail resent to Rebecca S. Legrand at The Commercial Law Group. (lh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 116 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:15-cv-01846. Original file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 3/4/2019. (jf)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the arguments raised in the #115 Plaintiffs' Status Report and the parties' previous arguments, the Court HEREBY STAYS its #113 January 2, 2019 Order and #114 January 2, 2019 Memorandum Opinion, and the Court TRANSFERS this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota ("District of North Dakota") pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Under Section 1406(a), a federal district court lacking personal jurisdiction over a defendant may transfer a case, "in the interest of justice," "to any other district or division where it might have been brought." 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); see also Dugdale v. Ditech Fin., LLC, No. 17-7137, 2018 WL 1391724, at *1 (D.C. Cir. Feb. 21, 2018). On January 2, 2019, this Court concluded that it lacked personal jurisdiction over nine defendants: (1) Samuel Peck, (2) SKE Midwestern, Inc. ("SKE"), (3) Emilio Farah, (4) Convalor, S.A.C., (5) Confactor, S.A.C., (6) Jorge Harten Costa, Sr., (7) Jorge Emilio Harten Rodriguez Larrain, Jr., (8) Ofelia Maria Rodriguez Larrain Salinas de Harten, and (9) Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas. Mem. Op., ECF No. 114 at 2, 49. Plaintiffs have requested that the Court stay its dismissal order and transfer this case to the District of North Dakota because two of the defendants (Samuel Peck and SKE) "would be at home in North Dakota." Pls.' Status Report, ECF No. 115 at 3. It is undisputed that SKE is subject to the general personal jurisdiction in the District of North Dakota -- the forum where it maintains its principal place of business. See Daimler AG v. Bauman, 134 S. Ct. 746, 760 (2014) (holding that the "place of incorporation and principal place of business are paradig[m]... bases for general jurisdiction" (alterations in original) (internal quotation marks omitted)). Indeed, the defendants have acknowledged that SKE's principal place of business is in North Dakota. See, e.g., SKE's Mem. in Opp'n to Pls.' Mot. for Jurisdictional Disc., ECF No. 69 at 4 n.2 ("As a North Dakota corporation with its principal place of business in Fargo, the courts of North Dakota have jurisdiction over SKE Midwestern."); Defs.' Mem. in Opp'n to Pls.' Mot. for Jurisdictional Disc., ECF No. 85 at 1 (stating that SKE's principal place of business is in North Dakota). Although the Court lacks personal jurisdiction over the nine defendants, the Court finds that transfer, rather than dismissal, is the appropriate remedy. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the District of North Dakota. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/22/2019. (lcegs3)
February 4, 2019 Filing 115 First STATUS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Weitzman, Bruce)
January 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/4/2019 (mac)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #113 Order and #114 Memorandum Opinion, which dismiss the nine defendants from this action, the status conference previously scheduled for January 3, 2019 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/2/2019. (lcegs3)
January 2, 2019 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/2/2019. (lcegs3)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #35 , #36 , #37 , #38 , #45 , #50 , #52 , #54 defendants' motions to dismiss. Defendants Javier; Jorge, Sr.; Jorge, Jr.; Ofelia; Mr. Farah; SKE; Confactor; Convalor; and Mr. Peck are hereby DISMISSED from this action. It is FURTHER ORDERED that #63 plaintiffs' motion for jurisdictional discovery is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that #62 , #89 plaintiffs' motions for alternative service and #76 defendant's motion to strike certain exhibits are DENIED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs are directed to file a status report providing recommendations for further proceedings by no later than February 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/2/2019. (lcegs3)
December 3, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #112 plaintiffs' motion for a status and scheduling conference. The status hearing is scheduled for January 3, 2019 at 10:30 am in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/3/2018. (lcegs3)
November 29, 2018 Filing 112 MOTION for Status and Scheduling Conference by NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weitzman, Bruce) .
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #109 plaintiffs' opposed motion to lift stay to file supplemental briefing regarding two recent cases in this Circuit. The Court has read the two cases and does not believe that additional briefing would be useful in resolving the pending motions before the Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/20/2018. (lcegs3)
July 5, 2018 Filing 111 RESPONSE (Oppositon) re #109 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by SKE MIDWESTERN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton) Modified on 7/6/2018 (ztd).
June 28, 2018 Filing 110 RESPONSE re #109 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Hunter)
June 28, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION to Lift Stay by NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weitzman, Bruce)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #108 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Bruce H. Weitzman is hereby admitted to practice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/28/2018. (lcegs3 )
March 27, 2018 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bruce H. Weitzman, :Firm- Bruce H. Weitzman, P.C., :Address- 400 E. South Water St., #4206, Chicago, IL 60601. Phone No. - 312-399-9363. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5390947. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bruce H. Weitzman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
March 26, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Phillip Cook (Cook, William)
November 28, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE of Change of Address by Creighton R. Magid (Magid, Creighton)
August 19, 2016 Filing 105 NOTICE Regarding the Relevance of RJR Nabisco by SAMUEL PECK (LeGrand, Rebecca)
August 19, 2016 Filing 104 NOTICE Regarding relevance of RJR Nabisco, Inc. v. European Community by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC re Order,,,,,, (Cook, William)
August 19, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE Regarding Relevance of RJR Nabisco, Inc. v. European Community by JORGE HARTEN COSTA, OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN, JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN, JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS re Order,,,,,, (Farr, Alec)
August 16, 2016 Filing 102 REPLY to opposition to motion re #89 MOTION for Order to allow service on Defendants Farah, Convalor, and Confactor pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) Reply to Opp'n of Def. Confactor filed by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Cook, William)
August 12, 2016 Filing 101 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,,,,, Regarding Relevance of RJR Nabisco, Inc. v. European Community filed by SKE MIDWESTERN, INC.. (Magid, Creighton)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #100 plaintiffs' motion to withdraw motion. Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment is hereby deemed WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 11, 2016. (lcegs3)
August 10, 2016 Filing 100 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 08/11/2016.....Proposed MOTION to Withdraw #43 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Ignacio Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Agricola Peruana Del Sol, S.R.L.; Peruvian Organic International Trading S.A.C.; Marysol Salazar, Manuel Vidaurre, and Felipe Bedregal by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Cook, William) Modified on 8/12/2016 (jf).
August 8, 2016 Filing 99 Memorandum in opposition to re #89 MOTION for Order to allow service on Defendants Farah, Convalor, and Confactor pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) filed by CONFACTOR S.A.C.. (Gehres, Edward)
August 4, 2016 Filing 98 REPLY to opposition to motion re #89 MOTION for Order to allow service on Defendants Farah, Convalor, and Confactor pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) filed by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1., Declaration of Enrique Ghersi, with Ex. A & B, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2., Declaration of William P. Cook, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3., Declaration of Ileana Boza)(Cook, William)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER re #97 parties' joint proposal for future proceedings. Upon consideration of the parties' joint recommendation for future proceedings, the parties shall comply with the following briefing schedule: plaintiffs shall file any motion to withdraw their pending motion for default judgment by no later than August 12, 2016; plaintiffs' reply in response to defendants Farah and Convalor's opposition to plaintiffs' motion for alternate service of process shall be filed by no later than August 4, 2016; defendant Confactor's opposition to plaintiffs' motion for alternate service of process shall be filed by no later than August 9, 2016, and plaintiffs' reply thereto shall be filed by no later than August 16, 2016. It is further ORDERED that each party shall have the opportunity to file a Notice to the Court discussing the relevance of the U.S. Supreme Court's decision in R.J.R. Nabisco, Inc. v. European Community, 136 S.Ct. 2090 (2016) to the instant case by no later than August 19, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the parties' request for a hearing is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. In the event the Court is unable to resolve the pending motions without a hearing, the Court will advise the parties and schedule the hearing for a mutually agreeable date and time. It is further ORDERED that all other activity in the case shall be stayed pending resolution of the pending motions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 26, 2016. (lcegs3)
July 25, 2016 Filing 97 NOTICE OF JOINT RECOMMENDATIONS FOR FUTURE PROCEEDINGS by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC re Order,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
July 25, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE of Proposed Order by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH re #95 Memorandum in Opposition (Carter, Hunter)
July 22, 2016 Filing 95 Memorandum in opposition to re #89 MOTION for Order to allow service on Defendants Farah, Convalor, and Confactor pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) filed by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH. (Carter, Hunter)
July 18, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE Responding to Court's Minute Order by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC re Order,,, (Cook, William)
July 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Recommendation Or Individual Recommendation From Each Party due by 7/25/2016. (mac)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing plaintiffs to file a notice with the Court by no later than July 18, 2016 indicating whether plaintiffs have obtained new permanent counsel in this action. Should plaintiffs seek additional time to obtain new permanent counsel in this action, plaintiffs shall file a motion requesting an extension of time by the same date. If plaintiffs do not intend to obtain new permanent counsel, plaintiffs are directed to confer with defense counsel and submit a joint recommendation for future proceedings by no later than July 25, 2016. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation for future proceedings, each party shall file an individual recommendation by no later than July 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 11, 2016. (lcegs3)
July 11, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH (Attachments: #1 RJR Nabisco Inc. v. European Community Decision)(Carter, Hunter)
April 12, 2016 Case Stayed (mac)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #88 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Thomas F. Urban, II. Upon review of Mr. Urban's motion to withdraw #88 , Mr. William P. Cook having entered his appearance on behalf of the plaintiffs #90 , and the plaintiffs having indicated they have no objection to the Court granting Mr. Urban's motion to withdraw #90 , it is hereby ORDERED that Mr. Urban's motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Mr. Urban is hereby terminated as counsel for plaintiffs in the instant action. It is further ORDERED that all proceedings before the Honorable Emmet G. Sullivan are hereby STAYED for a period of 90 days to allow plaintiffs to obtain permanent replacement counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 11, 2016. (lcegs3)
April 11, 2016 Filing 92 Memorandum in opposition to re #76 MOTION to Strike #64 Response to motion,,,,, Declarations and Exhibits filed by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
April 11, 2016 Filing 91 RESPONSE re #88 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Cook, William)
April 11, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by William Phillip Cook on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cook, William)
April 8, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION for Order to allow service on Defendants Farah, Convalor, and Confactor pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Farah Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ghersi Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
April 8, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by THOMAS F. URBAN, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
April 7, 2016 Filing 87 REPLY to opposition to motion re #63 MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery from each of the following Defendants: Jorge Harten Costa; Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten; Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Emilio Farah, Convalor S. filed by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William P. Cook, #2 Declaration Declaration of Thomas F. Urban II)(Urban, Thomas)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #86 motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 83.6(c)("If a trial date has been set, or if a party's written consent in not obtained, or if the party is not represented by another attorney, an attorney may withdraw an appearance for a party only by order of the court upon motion by the attorney served upon all parties to the case. Unless the party is represented by another attorney or the motion is made in open court in the party's presence, a motion to withdraw an appearance shall be accompanied by a certificate of service listing the party's last known address and stating that the attorney has served upon the party a copy of the motion and a notice advising the party to obtain other counsel, or, if the party intends to conduct the case pro se or to object to withdrawal, to so notify the Clerk in writing within seven days of service of the motion."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 7, 2016. (lcegs3)
April 6, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs filed by THOMAS F. URBAN, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
March 28, 2016 Filing 85 Memorandum in opposition to re #63 MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery from each of the following Defendants: Jorge Harten Costa; Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten; Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Emilio Farah, Convalor S. filed by JORGE HARTEN COSTA, OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN, JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN, JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS. (Farr, Alec)
March 28, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE of Second Declaration of Emilio Farah by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH re #82 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration and Exhibits of Emilio Farah)(Fowkes, Joshua)
March 25, 2016 Filing 83 REPLY to opposition to motion re #54 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SAMUEL PECK. (LeGrand, Rebecca)
March 25, 2016 Filing 82 REPLY to opposition to motion re #52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emilio Farah Declaration and Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Joshua Fowkes Declaration and Exhibits)(Carter, Hunter)
March 25, 2016 Filing 81 REPLY to opposition to motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process filed by JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement from Peruvian Law Expert)(Farr, Alec)
March 25, 2016 Filing 80 REPLY to opposition to motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process filed by JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement from Peruvian Law Expert)(Farr, Alec)
March 25, 2016 Filing 79 REPLY to opposition to motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process filed by OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement from Peruvian Law Expert)(Farr, Alec)
March 25, 2016 Filing 78 REPLY to opposition to motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SKE MIDWESTERN, INC.. (Magid, Creighton)
March 25, 2016 Filing 77 REPLY to opposition to motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process filed by JORGE HARTEN COSTA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement from Peruvian Law Expert)(Farr, Alec)
March 25, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION to Strike #64 Response to motion,,,,, Declarations and Exhibits by SKE MIDWESTERN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
March 25, 2016 Filing 75 REPLY to opposition to motion re #50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CONFACTOR S.A.C.. (Gehres, Edward)
March 24, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Harten Defendants Response To #63 Motion For Jurisdictional Discovery due by 3/28/2016. Plaintiffs Omnibus Reply In Support of #63 Plaintiffs' Motion For Jurisdictional Discovery due by 4/7/2016. (mac)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #74 defendants Convalor S.A.C.'s and Emilio Farah's unopposed motion to exceed page limit. Defendants Convalor S.A.C. and Emilio Farah's reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss shall not exceed 35 pages. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 23, 2016. (lcegs3)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #72 Harten defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time and granting #73 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time. The Harten defendants shall respond to #63 motion for jurisdictional discovery by no later than March 28, 2016, and the plaintiffs shall file their omnibus reply in support of #63 plaintiffs' motion for jurisdictional discovery by no later than April 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 23, 2016. (lcegs3)
March 23, 2016 Filing 74 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fowkes, Joshua)
March 23, 2016 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery from each of the following Defendants: Jorge Harten Costa; Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten; Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Emilio Farah, Convalor S. by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
March 22, 2016 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION toExtend Time to Respond to Jurisdictional Discovery Motion by JORGE HARTEN COSTA, OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN, JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN, JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec) Modified on 3/23/2016 (jf).
March 21, 2016 Filing 71 Memorandum in opposition to re #63 MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery from each of the following Defendants: Jorge Harten Costa; Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten; Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Emilio Farah, Convalor S. filed by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration and Exhibits of Emilio Farah, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Hunter)
March 19, 2016 Filing 70 Memorandum in opposition to re #63 MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery from each of the following Defendants: Jorge Harten Costa; Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten; Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Emilio Farah, Convalor S. filed by SAMUEL PECK. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Samuel Peck (Ex. A))(LeGrand, Rebecca)
March 18, 2016 Filing 69 Memorandum in opposition to re #63 MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery from each of the following Defendants: Jorge Harten Costa; Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten; Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Emilio Farah, Convalor S. filed by SKE MIDWESTERN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wesley Fong, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
March 14, 2016 Filing 68 Memorandum in opposition to re #63 MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery from each of the following Defendants: Jorge Harten Costa; Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten; Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Emilio Farah, Convalor S. filed by CONFACTOR S.A.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gehres, Edward)
March 14, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Convalor S.A.C., Emilio Farah, Samuel Peck, Confactor S.A.C., SKE Midwestern, Inc., Jorge Harten Costa, Jorge Emilio Harten, Rodrigue Larrain, Ofelia Maria Rodriguez, Larra De Harten, and Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas Reply Brief due by 3/25/2016. (mac)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting over objection #66 defendants Convalor S.A.C., Emilio Farah, Samuel Peck, Confactor S.A.C., SKE Midwestern, Inc., Jorge Harten Costa, Jorge Emilio Harten, Rodrigue Larrain, Ofelia Maria Rodriguez, Larra De Harten, and Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas' motion for extension of time. The above-name defendants shall file their reply brief by no later than March 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 14, 2016. (lcegs3)
March 14, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE re #66 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief filed by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 3.9.2016 Email from Farah Counsel requesting extension to 3/22, #3 Exhibit 3.9.2016 Email agreeing to extension to 3/22, #4 Exhibit 3.9.2016 Email to all Defendants re One week extension, #5 Exhibit 3.9.2016 Email from Farah Counsel seeking additional time, #6 Exhibit 3.10.206 Email from Farah Counsel to all Defense Counsel, #7 Exhibit 3.11.2016 Email to all Defense Counsel, #8 Exhibit 3.11.2016 Second Email to al Defense Counsel)(Urban, Thomas)
March 11, 2016 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fowkes, Joshua)
March 10, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Muha on behalf of SAMUEL PECK (Muha, Christopher)
March 8, 2016 Filing 64 RESPONSE re #50 MOTION to Dismiss , #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #54 MOTION to Dismiss , #52 MOTION to Dismiss , #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process filed by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration 1. Declaration of William P. Cook, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Cook Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Cook Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Cook Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Cook Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Cook Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Cook Delcaration, #8 Declaration 2. Declaration of Ileana Boza, #9 Declaration 3. Declaration of Enrique Ghersi, #10 Exhibit 4. SKE Chronology Prepared by Peck, #11 Exhibit 5. POIT 2014 Export Report, #12 Declaration 6. Declaration of Poppe Braam, #13 Declaration 7. Declaration of Oscar de Osma, #14 Exhibit 8. E-mail from Tanya Cruz)(Urban, Thomas)
March 4, 2016 Filing 63 MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs Jurisdictional Discovery from each of the following Defendants: Jorge Harten Costa; Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten; Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Emilio Farah, Convalor S.A.C., Confactor S.A.C., Samuel Peck, and SKE Midwestern, Inc. by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
March 1, 2016 Filing 62 MOTION For Order Allowing Service of Defendants Jorge Harten Costa, Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain, Ofelia Harten Rodriguez Larrain, and Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas Under FRCP 4(f)(3) by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Returns of Service, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Affidavits, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Ileana M. Boza, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Enrique Ghersi, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
February 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs Omnibus Response To All Pending Motions To Dismiss due by 3/8/2016. (mac)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #56 Motion for Scheduling Order and Stay of All Deadlines, and granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs shall file a single omnibus response to all pending motions to dismiss by no later than March 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 19, 2016. (lcegs3)
February 19, 2016 Filing 61 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #50 MOTION to Dismiss , #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , [3 filed by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Urban, Thomas)
February 18, 2016 Filing 60 Supplemental #57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #50 MOTION to Dismiss , #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #54 MOTION to Dismiss , #52 MOTION to Dismiss , #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas) Modified on 2/19/2016 (jf).
February 18, 2016 Filing 59 Memorandum in opposition to re #56 MOTION for Scheduling Order regarding Consideration of Motions to Dismiss filed by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Hunter)
February 18, 2016 Filing 58 Memorandum in opposition to re #43 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Ignacio Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Agricola Peruana Del Sol, S.R.L.; Peruvian Organic International Trading S.A.C.; Marysol Salazar, Manuel Vidaurre, and Felipe Bedregal filed by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Hunter)
February 17, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #50 MOTION to Dismiss , #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #54 MOTION to Dismiss , #52 MOTION to Dismiss , #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
February 17, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION for Scheduling Order regarding Consideration of Motions to Dismiss by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
February 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response To Motions To Dismiss Filed By Defendants Jorge Harten Costa, Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain, Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten and Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas due by 2/26/2016. (mac)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #51 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motions to dismiss filed by defendants Jorge Harten Costa, Jorge Harten Rodriguez Larrain, Ofelia Rodriguez Larrain de Harten, and Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas by no later than February 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 16, 2016. (lcegs3)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jamie D. Guttman is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 16, 2016. (lcegs3)
February 12, 2016 Filing 55 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONFACTOR S.A.C. (Gehres, Edward)
February 12, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss by SAMUEL PECK (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(LeGrand, Rebecca)
February 12, 2016 Filing 53 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONVALOR S.A.C (Carter, Hunter)
February 12, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order (s), #5 Certificate of Service)(Carter, Hunter)
February 12, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process, #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
February 12, 2016 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss by CONFACTOR S.A.C. (Gehres, Edward)
February 12, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jaime D Guttman, :Firm- Private Advising Group, PA, :Address- 600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1607. Phone No. - 786-292-1599. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4411841. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONFACTOR S.A.C. (Gehres, Edward)
February 10, 2016 Filing 48 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SKE MIDWESTERN, INC. (Magid, Creighton)
February 8, 2016 Filing 47 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JAVIER URTEAGA (jf)
February 8, 2016 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT for Entry of Default against Javier Urteaga by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Affidavit Military Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas) Modified on 2/8/2016 (jf).
February 5, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SKE MIDWESTERN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Tania Cruz and Logan Rutherford are hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 5, 2016. (lcegs3)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER treating as opposed and granting over objection #31 defendant Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas' motion for extension of time. Defendant Salinas' motion to dismiss #35 is hereby deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 5, 2016. (lcegs3)
February 5, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Creighton R. Magid on behalf of SKE MIDWESTERN, INC. (Magid, Creighton)
February 4, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Ignacio Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Agricola Peruana Del Sol, S.R.L.; Peruvian Organic International Trading S.A.C.; Marysol Salazar, Manuel Vidaurre, and Felipe Bedregal by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Urban, Thomas)
February 3, 2016 Filing 42 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PERUVIAN ORGANIC INTERNATIONAL TRADING S.A.C. (znmw)
February 2, 2016 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT against Defendant Peruvian Organic International Trading SAC by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC. (Urban, Thomas)
February 2, 2016 Filing 40 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AGRICOLA PERUANA DEL SOL, S.R.L., FELIPE BEDREGAL, IGNACIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN, PERUVIAN ORGANIC INTERNATIONAL TRADING S.A.C., MARYSOL SALAZAR, MANUEL VIDUARRE (jf)
February 2, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter T. Carter on behalf of CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH (Carter, Hunter)
February 1, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process by OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Exhibit B to Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec)
February 1, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process by JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Exhibit B to Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec)
February 1, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process by JORGE HARTEN COSTA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Exhibit B to Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec)
February 1, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process by JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Exhibit B to Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec)
February 1, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Logan Rutherford, :Firm- Bryan Cave LLP, :Address- One Kansas City Place, 1200 Main Street, Suite 3800. Phone No. - 816-374-3319. Fax No. - 816-374-3300 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4396671. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JORGE HARTEN COSTA, OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN, JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN, JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec)
February 1, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tania Cruz, :Firm- Bryan Cave LLP, :Address- 200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 400. Phone No. - 786-322-7500. Fax No. - 786-322-7501 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4396656. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JORGE HARTEN COSTA, OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN, JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN, JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec)
February 1, 2016 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT for Entry of Default for Defendants Ignacio Harten Rodriguez Larrain; Agricola Peruana Del Sol, S.R.L.; Peruvian Organic International Trading S.A.C., Marysol Salazar, Javier Rodriguez Larrain Salinas, Manuel Vidaurre, and Felipe Bedregal by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exh A Affidavot in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit Exh B Affidavit re Military Service, #3 Exhibit Exh C Proposed Entry of Default)(Urban, Thomas) Modified on 2/2/2016 (jf).
January 29, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint to 2/1/16 by JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec) Modified on 2/1/2016 (jf).
January 29, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Alec W. Farr on behalf of JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS (Farr, Alec)
January 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Convalor S.A.C. and Emilio Farah's Answer due by 2/12/2016 (mac)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 defendants Convalor S.A.C. and Emilio Farah's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants Convalor S.A.C. and Emilio Farah shall file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint by no later than February 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 28, 2016. (lcegs3)
January 28, 2016 Filing 29 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IGNACIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 28 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MANUEL VIDUARRE served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 27 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAVIER URTEAGA served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 25 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PERUVIAN ORGANIC INTERNATIONAL TRADING S.A.C. served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARYSOL SALAZAR served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JORGE HARTEN COSTA served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EMILIO FARAH served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONVALOR S.A.C served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONFACTOR S.A.C. served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FELIPE BEDREGAL served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015 (Urban, Thomas)
January 26, 2016 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fowkes, Joshua)
January 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/1/2016. (mac)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 defendants' Jorge Harten Costa, Sr., Jorge Emilio Harten Rodriguez Larrain, Jr., and Ofelia Maria Rodriguez Larrain Salinas de Hartens (collectively, the "Hartens'") unopposed motion for extension of time. The Hartens shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint by no later than February 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 20, 2016. (lcegs3)
January 19, 2016 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by JORGE HARTEN COSTA, OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN, JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farr, Alec)
January 19, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alec W. Farr on behalf of JORGE HARTEN COSTA, OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN, JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN (Farr, Alec)
January 8, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: answer due 1/4/2016 (jf)
January 7, 2016 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. served on 12/14/2015, answer due 1/4/2016 (Urban, Thomas)
January 7, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer due by 2/12/2016. (mac)
January 4, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #11 Summons Returned Executed was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading (jf)
December 31, 2015 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AGRICOLA PERUANA DEL SOL, S.R.L. served on 12/14/2015, answer due 1/4/2016 (Urban, Thomas)
December 31, 2015 Filing 11 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SKE MIDWESTERN, INC. served on 12/14/2015, answer due 1/4/2016 (Urban, Thomas) Modified on 1/4/2016 (jf).
December 31, 2015 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SAMUEL PECK served on 12/14/2015, answer due 1/4/2016 (Urban, Thomas)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 , #9 , defendants' unopposed motions for extension of time. Defendants shall file answers, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint, by no later than February 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 31, 2015. (lcegs3)
December 29, 2015 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by SAMUEL PECK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LeGrand, Rebecca)
December 29, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca S. LeGrand on behalf of SAMUEL PECK (LeGrand, Rebecca)
December 21, 2015 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by CONFACTOR S.A.C. (Gehres, Edward)
December 21, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D. Gehres on behalf of CONFACTOR S.A.C. (Gehres, Edward)
November 13, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS (12)Issued Electronically as to FELIPE BEDREGAL, C&V EXPORTS, S.A.C., JORGE HARTEN COSTA, OFELIA MARIA RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE HARTEN, GONZALO RODRIGUEZ LARRA DE LAVELLE, JORGE EMILIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN, PERUVIAN ORGANIC INTERNATIONAL TRADING S.A.C., NILTON PALACIOS POZO, ANTONIO SALAZAR SALAZAR, JAVIER RODRIGUEZ LARRA SALINAS, JAVIER URTEAGA, MANUEL VIDUARRE. (jf)
November 10, 2015 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Attached Summons filed by NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., WILLIAM P COOK. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bedregal, #2 Summons C&V Exports, #3 Summons Gonzalo, #4 Summons Harten Jr, #5 Summons Harten Sr, #6 Summons Javier, #7 Summons Ofelia, #8 Summons POIT, #9 Summons Pozo, #10 Summons Urteaga, #11 Summons Viduarre, #12 Summons Salazar)(Urban, Thomas)
November 9, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to AGRICOLA PERUANA DEL SOL, S.R.L., CONFACTOR S.A.C., CONVALOR S.A.C, EMILIO FARAH, IGNACIO HARTEN RODRIGUE LARRAIN, GIULIANA PASQUALE, SAMUEL PECK, MARYSOL SALAZAR, SKE MIDWESTERN, INC.. (jf)
October 30, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corrected Summons by WILLIAM P COOK, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC re Summons Not Issued (Urban, Thomas)
October 30, 2015 SUMMONS Not Issued as to ALL DEFENDANTS. (SUMMONS WERE INCORRECTLY FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. NO INFORMATION WAS SAVED ON ANY OF THE SUMMONS) (md)
October 30, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md)
October 30, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4298645) filed by NUEVOS DESTINOS, LLC, NUEVOS DESTINOS PERU, S.A.C., WILLIAM P COOK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Peck Summons, #3 Summons Harten Larrain Summons, #4 Summons Marysol Salazar Summons, #5 Summons SKE Midwestern Summons, #6 Summons Farah Summons, #7 Summons Convalor Summons, #8 Summons Confactor Summons, #9 Summons Pasquale Summons, #10 Summons APS Summons, #11 Summons C&V Exports Summons, #12 Summons Harten Costa, Sr Summons, #13 Summons Jorge Jr Summons, #14 Summons Ofelia Summons, #15 Summons POIT Summons, #16 Summons Javier Salinas Summons, #17 Summons Gonzalo Summons, #18 Summons Urteaga Summons, #19 Summons Viduarre Summons, #20 Summons Bedregal Summons, #21 Summons Pozo Summons, #22 Summons Antonio Salazar Summons)(Urban, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuevos Destinos, LLC et al v. Peck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giuliana Pasquale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marysol Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Rodriguez Larra Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Urteaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Salazar Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agricola Peruana Del Sol, S.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilton Palacios Pozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Emilio Harten Rodrigue Larrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalo Rodriguez Larra De Lavalle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofelia Maria Rodriguez Larra De Harten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ignacio Harten Rodrigue Larrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Harten Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peruvian Organic International Trading S.A.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convalor S.A.C.
Represented By: Hunter T. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Viduarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Bedregal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio Farah
Represented By: Hunter T. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confactor S.A.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&V Exports, S.A.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKE Midwestern, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P Cook
Represented By: Bruce Howard Weitzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuevos Destinos Peru, S.A.C.
Represented By: Bruce Howard Weitzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuevos Destinos, LLC
Represented By: Bruce Howard Weitzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?