Embrey v. State of North Dakota et al

Plaintiff: William J.R. Embrey
Defendant: State of North Dakota, Unknown Individuals and Wayne Stenehyem
Case Number: 3:2019cv00080
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION requesting the Court to move forward with the case and order the summons and complaint served by William J.R. Embrey. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by William J.R. Embrey. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(as)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against State of North Dakota, Wayne Stenehyem, Unknown Individuals filed by William J.R. Embrey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William J.R. Embrey)(lh)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William J.R. Embrey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/17/2019. (js)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William J.R. Embrey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William Ebrey in Support of IFP Motion, #2 Proposed complaint and affidavit of Mr. Embrey, #3 Mailing Envelope)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Embrey v. State of North Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Stenehyem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J.R. Embrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?