Abdulqader et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Manasa Taher, Baderkhan Waisy, Dilbar Abdulqader and M. T.
Defendant: Family Health Care Center and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00126
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Andrea Herzog re #21 MEMORANDUM in Support, #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims by United States of America. (Burkland, Melissa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Napoleon Espejo, M.D. re #21 MEMORANDUM in Support, #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims by United States of America. (Burkland, Melissa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Meredith Torres re #21 MEMORANDUM in Support, #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notification)(Burkland, Melissa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims filed by United States of America. (Burkland, Melissa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims by United States of America. (Burkland, Melissa) (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/23/2019 to remove minors name. NEF regenerated.) (as)
June 28, 2019 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal is CANCELLED. See Order at #19 . (js) Distributed on 7/1/2019 (js).
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2019. See Order at #19 . (js)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #13 Motion to Stay. (CS) Distributed on 6/28/2019 (js).
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 REDACTION to #9 MOTION to Substitute Party by United States of America. (as)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 REDACTION to #8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by United States of America. (as)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 REDACTION to #7 Notice of Appearance by Tara V. Iverson by United States of America. (as)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 REDACTION to #6 Notice of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland by United States of America. (as)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 REDACTION to #1 Notice of Removal, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Answer and Demand of Jury Trial)(as)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #10 Order,, Set Hearings, by United States of America. (Burkland, Melissa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by United States of America. (as) Modified on 6/27/2019 to correct filer per substitution of party at #11 . (as)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney--Attorney Benjamin E. Thomas terminated--and granting #9 Motion to Substitute Party. (CS) Distributed on 6/27/2019 (as)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS) Distributed on 6/26/2019 (lh). (Main Document 10 replaced on 6/27/2019 to remove minors name per chambers request. NEF regenerated to USA. Not redistributed per chambers.) (as)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 *SEALED* MOTION to Substitute Party by Family Health Care Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Nicholas Chase)(Burkland, Melissa) Modified on 6/27/2019 to seal document as it contains minors name. See Order at #11 . (as)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 *SEALED* MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Family Health Care Center. (Burkland, Melissa) Modified on 6/27/2019 to seal document as it contained minors name. See Order at #11 . (as)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 *SEALED* NOTICE of Appearance by Tara V. Iversen on behalf of Family Health Care Center (Iversen, Tara) Modified on 6/27/2019 to seal document as it contains name of minor. See Order #11 . (as)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 *SEALED* NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Burkland on behalf of Family Health Care Center (Burkland, Melissa) Modified on 6/27/2019 to seal document as it contains name of minor. See Order #11 . (as)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to M. T. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/9/2019. (js) Modified on 6/27/2019 to remove minors name. See Order at #11 . (as)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Baderkhan Waisy. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/9/2019. (js)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dilbar Abdulqader. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/9/2019. (js)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Family Health Care Center. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/9/2019. (js)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 *SEALED* NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Family Health Care Center from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2018-CV-03306, filed by Family Health Care Center. (Filing fee: Waived) (Attachments: #1 *SEALED* Civil Cover Sheet, #2 *SEALED* Exhibit A - Summons, #3 *SEALED* Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 *SEALED* Exhibit C - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial, #5 Exhibit D - Rule 16 Order)(js) Modified on 6/27/2019 to seal main document, cover sheet and Exhibits A-C as they contain the name of the minor. See Order #11 . (as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdulqader et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manasa Taher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baderkhan Waisy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilbar Abdulqader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Health Care Center
Represented By: Benjamin E. Thomas
Represented By: Kent Rockstad
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Represented By: Tara V. Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kent Rockstad
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Represented By: Tara V. Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?