Hempstead v. Jade Presents LLC

Plaintiff: Bryan Hempstead
Defendant: Jade Presents LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00148
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
2 Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jade Presents LLC.(Fremstad, Joel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Fremstad on behalf of Jade Presents LLC (Fremstad, Joel)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 AO-121 Form mailed to Register of Copyrights. (as)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jade Presents LLC. (as)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jade Presents LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000420) filed by Bryan Hempstead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photos by Hempstead, #2 Exhibit B - Screenshots of Photos on Jade Presents Website, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hempstead v. Jade Presents LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jade Presents LLC
Represented By: Joel M. Fremstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Hempstead
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?