Phelps v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Phelps
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc., Title365 Company and CoreLogic Credco LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00158
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Edwards on behalf of Title365 Company (Edwards, Erin)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland for all further proceedings. Judge Peter D. Welte no longer assigned to the case. by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(td)
August 30, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerks office modified docket text identifying the following as Corporate Parents: Experience 1, Inc., Xome Inc., Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Home Realty Services LLC, Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent NSM Holdings, KKR Wand Investors Corporation for Title365 Company. (js)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Title365 Company identifying Corporate Parent Experience 1, Inc., Corporate Parent Xome Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Home Realty Services LLC, Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent NSM Holdings, Corporate Parent KKR Wand Investors Corporation for Title365 Company. (Balser, Justin) Modified on 8/30/2019 to add corporate parents to docket text. (js)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Title365 Company.(Balser, Justin)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Title365 Company answer due 8/27/2019. (CS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Title365 Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Balser, Justin) Modified on 8/21/2019 to remove incorrect attachment category. (as)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quicken Loans, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Rock Holdings Inc. for Quicken Loans, Inc... (Stock, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Quicken Loans, Inc..(Stock, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Phelps. Title365 Company served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019 (Lyons, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Phelps. Quicken Loans, Inc. served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019 (Lyons, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CoreLogic Credco LLC.(McLean, Ian)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland to Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CoreLogic Credco LLC, Quicken Loans, Inc., Title365 Company. (cjs)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CoreLogic Credco LLC, Quicken Loans, Inc., Title365 Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119001230) filed by Rebecca Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelps v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Phelps
Represented By: Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title365 Company
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Represented By: Erin Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Credco LLC
Represented By: Rebecca S. Thiem
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?