Vasvick et al v. Kaler
Appellant: Darrell H. Vasvick, Susan M. Vasvick and Justin Vasvick
Appellee: Kip M Kaler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00176
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
2 Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting #8 Stipulation. Appellants' brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript. Appellee's responsive brief is due within 30 days of the filing of appellants' brief. Appellants' reply is due within 14 days of the filing of the response. (AS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION on Proposed Briefing Schedule by Darrell H. Vasvick, Justin Vasvick, Susan M. Vasvick. (Brakke, Jon)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland for all further proceedings. Judge Peter D. Welte no longer assigned to the case. by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(td)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT re: briefing schedule by Darrell H. Vasvick, Justin Vasvick, Susan M. Vasvick. (Brakke, Jon)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT (Record on Appeal) to document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, by Darrell H. Vasvick, Justin Vasvick, Susan M. Vasvick. (as)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Darrell H. Vasvick, Justin Vasvick, Susan M. Vasvick Request for Transcripts to Johnson Reporting (Brakke, Jon)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Darrell H. Vasvick, Justin Vasvick, Susan M. Vasvick Statement of Issues to be Presented (Brakke, Jon)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text Only) ORDER for Proposed Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Counsel shall confer and file a joint proposed briefing schedule by 09/01/2019. (CS)
August 13, 2019 Deadlines Terminated. Appellant Brief due date inadvertently set, 8/27/2019 due date is TERMINATED. (js)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Record on Appeal) Bankruptcy Court case number 16-30652. File received from Bankruptcy Court filed by Susan M. Vasvick, Justin Vasvick, Darrell H. Vasvick. Appellant Brief due by 8/27/2019.(Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet for Bankruptcy Case, #2 Memorandum and Order, #3 Judgment)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasvick et al v. Kaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Darrell H. Vasvick
Represented By: Jon R. Brakke
Represented By: Drew James Hushka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Susan M. Vasvick
Represented By: Jon R. Brakke
Represented By: Drew James Hushka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Justin Vasvick
Represented By: Jon R. Brakke
Represented By: Drew James Hushka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kip M Kaler
Represented By: Patrick J. Sinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?