Gapp v. Doeling
Appellant: Wayne A. Gapp
Appellee: Gene W. Doeling
Case Number: 3:2019cv00177
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Referring Judge: Alice R Senechal
2 Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal #8 Stipulation. Appellant's brief is due within 45 days of the filing of the transcript. Appellee's responsive brief is due within 30 days of the filing of Appellant's brief. Appellant's reply brief is due within 15 days of the filing of Appellee's responsive brief. (AS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION on Proposed Briefing Schedule by Wayne A. Gapp. (Brakke, Jon)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Wayne A. Gapp. Amendment to #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Adversary Case Docket. (Brakke, Jon)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland for all further proceedings. Judge Peter D. Welte no longer assigned to the case. by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(td)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Attachment 1 to Doc. #1 contains personally identifying information. The clerk is directed to seal that docket entry. Appellant's counsel is directed to file a redacted version of that attachment within three business days. (CS)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT re: briefing schedule by Wayne A. Gapp. (Brakke, Jon)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT (Record on Appeal) to document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Wayne A. Gapp. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues, #2 E-mail Re: Transcript Ordered)(as)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text Only) ORDER for Proposed Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Counsel shall confer and file a joint proposed briefing schedule by 09/01/2019. (CS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Record on Appeal) Bankruptcy Court case number 17-30536. File received from Bankruptcy Court filed by Wayne A. Gapp. (Attachments: #1 *SEALED* Docket Sheet for Bankruptcy Case, #2 Memorandum and Order, #3 Judgment)(js) Modified on 9/6/2019 to seal attachment #1. (as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gapp v. Doeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wayne A. Gapp
Represented By: Jon R. Brakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gene W. Doeling
Represented By: Gene W. Doeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?