ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Bredahl & Associates, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Wane Engkjer, Jeff A. Bredahl, Esq., Bruce Engkjer, Bredahl & Associates, P.C. and Legacy Steel Building, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00195
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin D. Hartzell. (rh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin D. Hartzell (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1837700) by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (rh)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer, Legacy Steel Building, Inc..(Sortland, Paul)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Bruce Engkjer waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Wane Engkjer waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Legacy Steel Building, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Palmer, J.)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brooke H. McCarthy. (as)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brooke H. McCarthy (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1838699) by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Brooke) Modified on 10/4/2019 to add receipt number. (as)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Bredahl & Associates, P.C. waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Palmer, J.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Jeff A. Bredahl, Esq waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Palmer, J.)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Judge Peter D. Welte and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (js)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (js)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/26/2019. (lf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeff A. Bredahl, Esq, Bredahl & Associates, P.C., Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer, Legacy Steel Building, Inc. (lf)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeff A. Bredahl, Esq, Bredahl & Associates, P.C., Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer, Legacy Steel Building, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000505) filed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Legacy Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Elite Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - March 3, 2016 Notice of Trial, #6 Exhibit E - July 2016 Motion to Compel, #7 Exhibit F - August 2016 Order, #8 Exhibit G - August 18, 2016 Notice of Entry of Order, #9 Exhibit H - November 2017 Engkjer Affidavit, #10 Exhibit I - March 2017 Motion to Continue, #11 Exhibit J - November 2017 Smith Affidavit, #12 Exhibit K - March 2017 Order, #13 Exhibit L - March 2017 Judgment, #14 Exhibit M - COS Notice of Entry of March 2017 Order & Judgment, #15 Exhibit N - December 2017 Order)(lf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Bredahl & Associates, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wane Engkjer
Represented By: Paul A. Sortland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff A. Bredahl, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Engkjer
Represented By: Paul A. Sortland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bredahl & Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Steel Building, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Sortland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Represented By: Brooke McCarthy
Represented By: Kevin D. Hartzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?