Lemnus v. CHS Inc.
Plaintiff: Billinda Lemnus
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00211
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference REset for 1/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Jury Trial REset for 1/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Trial Est. 4 Days). (Previously set for 2/26/2021 in error) (js)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Trial Est. 4 Days). (AS)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Discovery Motions due by 6/15/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/1/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/1/2020. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/1/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 1/1/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 2/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 2/1/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 2/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/24/2020. A Mid-Discovery Status Conference is set for 3/11/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 11/7/2019. (lc)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CHS Inc.. (Novak, Anthony)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Billinda Lemnus. (pb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by CHS Inc. (pb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Billinda Lemnus. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/8/2019. (pb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to CHS Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/8/2019. (pb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHS Inc. from Richland County District Court, case number not assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 319000524 filed by CHS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Richland County Summons, #3 Richland County Complaint, #4 Certificate of Service)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemnus v. CHS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billinda Lemnus
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Sara M. Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Novak
Represented By: Mark A. Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?