Ivey v. LM Windpower et al
Plaintiff: Steven Ivey
Defendant: Kelly's Services, LM Windpower, North Dakota WSI and Nilles Law Firm
Case Number: 3:2019cv00219
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #4 Complaint filed by Steven Ivey be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 12/9/2019. (AS) Distributed on 11/26/2019 (as)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Steven Ivey (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form, #2 Clerk's Response, #3 Mailing Envelope) (td)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Steven Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope). Case previously reassigned. Filed per Chambers. (pb)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Judge Peter D. Welte and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (cc: plaintiff)(as)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Steven Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(as)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Ivey (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Steven Ivey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/28/2019. (js)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kelly's Services, LM Windpower, Nilles Law Firm, North Dakota WSI (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Steven Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Designation of Related Civil Cases Pending)(as)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (CS) Distributed on 10/7/2019. (as)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Steven Ivey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/18/2019. (rh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Designation of Related Civil Cases Pending, #4 Mailing Envelope)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivey v. LM Windpower et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly's Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Windpower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota WSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilles Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?