Zespy et al v. Dakota Molding, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zespy Family, LLC and J. Gary Zespy
Defendant: Dakota Molding, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00223
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION to Remand by J. Gary Zespy, Zespy Family, LLC. (McLean, Ian)
December 6, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #22 REPLY to Response to Motion. Filed in error. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Counsel will re-file corrected document. (pb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss, #8 MOTION for Joinder Dakota Molding, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Motion to Join Additional Third-Party Defendants or to Dismiss filed by Dakota Molding, Inc.. (Raum, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Joinder Dakota Molding, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Defendant's Motion to Join Additional Third-Party Defendants or to Dismiss filed by Dakota Molding, Inc.. (Raum, Michael) Modified to restrict access per request of counsel on 12/6/2019 (pb).
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 12/5/2019. (lc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (trial est. 6 days) (CS)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 9/4/2020. Discovery Motions due by 10/1/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/1/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/2/2020. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/1/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 2/1/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 2/28/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 9/4/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 9/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2020. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call into chambers at (701) 297-7070.(CS)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Dakota Molding, Inc.. (Raum, Michael)
December 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand . Response due by 12/4/2019 (js)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting #14 Stipulation by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Defendant's response to #5 MOTION to Remand due by 12/04/2019. (CS)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss, #8 MOTION for Joinder filed by J. Gary Zespy, Zespy Family, LLC. (McLean, Ian)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION to Remand Joint Stipulation Related to Deadline for Defendant to File Response to Motion to Remand by Dakota Molding, Inc.. (Raum, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kasey D. McNary on behalf of J. Gary Zespy, Zespy Family, LLC (McLean, Ian) Modified on 12/3/2019 to correct name of attorney appearing. Regenerated NEF (cjs).
November 20, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerks Office added MOTION to Dismiss at 12 . (js)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Dakota Molding, Inc. See document filed at #8 . (js)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dakota Molding, Inc. re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support, #8 MOTION To Join Additional Parties as Third Party Defendants or to Dismiss to Ron McLean (Raum, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dakota Molding, Inc. re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support, #8 MOTION To Join Additional Parties as Third Party Defendants or to Dismiss to Michael L. Gust (Raum, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION To Join Additional Parties as Third Party Defendants or 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dakota Molding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DMI's Proposed First Amended Answer, Counterclaim, and Third PartyComplaint)(Raum, Michael) Modified on 11/20/2019 to add link and remove duplicative docket text. (js)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION To Join Additional Parties as Third Party Defendants or to Dismiss by Dakota Molding, Inc. (Raum, Michael) Modified on 11/20/2019 (js).
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim #3 by J. Gary Zespy, Zespy Family, LLC.(McLean, Ronald)
November 13, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 MOTION to Remand and #6 MEMORANDUM in Support. Modified entries to reflect additional filer (Zespy Family, LLC). (pb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by J. Gary Zespy, Zespy Family, LLC. (McLean, Ian) Modified to add additional filer (Zespy Family, LLC) on 11/13/2019 (pb).
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by J. Gary Zespy, Zespy Family, LLC. (McLean, Ian) Modified to add additional filer (Zespy Family, LLC) on 11/13/2019 (pb).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant Dakota Molding, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Dakota Molding, Inc.. (Raum, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dakota Molding, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Unity Industries, Inc. for Dakota Molding, Inc. (as)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dakota Molding, Inc. from Cass County District Court, case number not assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 320000018 filed by Dakota Molding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zespy et al v. Dakota Molding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Molding, Inc.
Represented By: Aubrey J. Zuger
Represented By: Michael S. Raum
Represented By: David B. Tibbals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zespy Family, LLC
Represented By: Aubrey J. Zuger
Represented By: Michael S. Raum
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Represented By: Kasey D. McNary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Gary Zespy
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Represented By: Kasey D. McNary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?