Hutchinson v. Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cheryl M. Hutchinson
Defendant: Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00226
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 RESPONSE to Motion. Clerks office added exhibit numbers to docket text. (js)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cheryl M. Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mark Peschel, #2 Exhibit 1 - Patient Consent Form, #3 Exhibit 2 - Patient Consent Form, #4 Exhibit 3 - Manufacturer information, #5 Exhibit 4 - Rejuv website pages)(Peschel, Mark) Modified on 12/9/2019 to add exhibit numbers. (js)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case assigned to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (js)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc. (js)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/3/2019. (js)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc.. (Waller, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc.. (Waller, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Cheryl M. Hutchinson. (as)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl M. Hutchinson. Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc. served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019 (Peschel, Mark)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cheryl M. Hutchinson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/12/2019. (js)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cheryl M. Hutchinson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/29/2019. (js)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc. (js)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000024) filed by Cheryl M. Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct party filed against in docket text - NEF Regenerated. (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rejuv Medical Aesthetic Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl M. Hutchinson
Represented By: Mark J. Peschel
Represented By: Mark J Peschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?