Glinz Grain, LLC v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Glinz Grain, LLC
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00254
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fargo ADR Room before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (CS)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Trial Estimate: 4 days) (CS) Modified on 12/30/2019 to add trial estimate. (as)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Discovery Motions due by 8/14/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/14/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/11/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 10/16/2020. Join Additional Parties due by 3/27/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2020. Nondispositive Motions due by 10/2/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2020. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call into chambers at (701) 297-7070.(CS)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 12/27/2019. (lc)
December 27, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #14 Stipulation for Discovery Plan. Filed in error. Document should have been emailed to chambers. Clerk's office restricted access to document. (lc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* STIPULATION for discovery plan by Glinz Grain, LLC. (Budke, Will) Modified on 12/27/2019 to restrict access. (lc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Glinz Grain, LLC. (js)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (as)
November 25, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Answer to Complaint. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access and re-filed as Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) at #11 . Re: #9 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office linked to corrected entry. (rh)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (rh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company re #11 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (O'Connell, Nicholas) Modified on 11/25/2019 to link to corrected entry. (rh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.(O'Connell, Nicholas) Modified on 11/25/2019 to restrict access. (rh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Glinz Grain, LLC. (Budke, Will)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Glinz Grain, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/5/2019. (cjs)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Will Budke on behalf of Glinz Grain, LLC (Budke, Will)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/2/2019. (as)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (as)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (as)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company from Stutsman County District Court, case number not assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000158 filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glinz Grain, LLC v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glinz Grain, LLC
Represented By: Will Budke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas J. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?