Hennager v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: John Hennager
Defendant: United States of America and Bureau of Indian Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00258
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by Jonathon F. Yunker on behalf of John Hennager (Yunker, Jonathon)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America served on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Traynor, Daniel)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Traynor, Daniel)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Indian Education served on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Traynor, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Indian Education, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (as)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Education, United States of America (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000077) filed by John Hennager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claim for Damage, Injury, or Death, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hennager v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hennager
Represented By: Daniel M. Traynor
Represented By: David A. Owens
Represented By: Jonathon F. Yunker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?