Hinkley v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tom Hinkley
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00269
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Joint Motion) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 2/3/2020. (lc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Joint Motion) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Tom Hinkley. (js)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Tom Hinkley. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/20/2019. (as)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (as)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000088) filed by Tom Hinkley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinkley v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Hinkley
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?