Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Jenny Grant and Darren Patterson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00278
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jenny Grant, Darren Patterson filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Information, 09-2017-CR-02137, #2 Exhibit 2 - Criminal Judgment, 09-2017-CR-02137, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cass County Complaint, 09-2019-CV-01563, #4 Exhibit 4 - Policy, OA4370687)(pb) (Attachment 4 replaced to attach complete exhibit on 2/11/2020) (pb).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #12 Stipulation to Amend Complaint filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. The Clerk is directed to file the proposed amended complaint. (AS)
February 10, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 AMENDED COMPLAINT. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and refiled as STIPULATION at #12 . (pb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint with its Exhibits 1-4)(pb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jenny Grant re #10 Notice of Appearance (Dunn, Daniel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Dunn on behalf of Jenny Grant (Dunn, Daniel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* Exhibit Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment with Exhibits)(Preus, Christian) Modified to restrict access on 2/10/2020 (pb).
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Darren Patterson waiver sent on 12/26/2019, answer due 2/24/2020. (Preus, Christian)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Jenny Grant waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Preus, Christian)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case assigned to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge (pb). Modified on 1/6/2020 to clarify judge association. Regenerated NEF(cjs).
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (pb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachussetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Safeco Insurance Company of America. (pb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Safeco Insurance Company of America. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/31/2019. (pb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jenny Grant, Darren Patterson. (pb) (Main Document 2 replaced to correct case number on 12/17/2019) (pb). NEF regenerated.
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jenny Grant, Darren Patterson (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000105) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Information, 09-2017-CR-02137, #3 Exhibit 2 - Criminal Judgment, 09-2017-CR-02137, #4 Exhibit 3 - Cass County Complaint, 09-2019-CV-01563, #5 Exhibit 4 - Policy, OA4370687)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Christian A. Preus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Grant
Represented By: Duane A. Lillehaug
Represented By: Michael J. Williams
Represented By: Daniel J. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Patterson
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?