Galvanizers, Inc. et al v. Kautzman et al
Plaintiff: K and K Construction and Repair, Inc. and Galvanizers, Inc.
Defendant: Paul Kautzman and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00282
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (js)
February 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Certified copy of #22 Order remanding case to state court mailed to Clerk of Cass County District Court - Fargo, ND. (js)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte adopting #20 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant United States and #21 Stipulation to Remand to State Court; finding as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #17 Motion to Withdraw Document. (MK)
February 4, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT by Galvanizers, Inc., K and K Construction and Repair, Inc.. (Hanson, Stephen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT UNITED STATES by Galvanizers, Inc., K and K Construction and Repair, Inc.. (Hanson, Stephen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Status Conference held on 2/4/2020. (DR #200204-000.mp3 - JS Chambers Recorder) (as)
January 27, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 RESPONSE to Motion, #14 RESPONSE to Motion. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to documents and re-filed as Motion to Withdraw Document/Motion to Remand to State Court at #17 , and as Affidavit at #18 . RE: #15 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office removed and added links. (am)
January 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
January 23, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan T. Garaas re #17 MOTION to Withdraw Document, MOTION to Remand to State Court by Paul Kautzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Relating to IRS Payment)(am)
January 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw Document (Counterclaim), MOTION to Remand to State Court by Paul Kautzman. (am)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Kautzman re #12 Notice of Appearance, #17 MOTION to Withdraw Document (Counterclaim), MOTION to Remand to State Court, #18 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan T. Garaas, to Wall & Hanson & Aldrich (Garaas, Jonathan) Modified on 1/27/2020 to remove and add links (am).
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Seek Alternative Counsel, And Jurisdictional Issues, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Affidavit Of Jonathan T. Garaas - Withdrawal Of Counterclaim filed by Paul Kautzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Mail Relating To IRS Payment)(Garaas, Jonathan) Modified on 1/27/2020 to restrict access (am).
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Seek Alternative Counsel, And Jurisdictional Issues, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Withdrawal Of Counterclaim & Legal Brief (Possible Motion For Return To State Court) filed by Paul Kautzman. (Garaas, Jonathan) Modified on 1/27/2020 to restrict access (am).
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan T. Garaas on behalf of Paul Kautzman (Garaas, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant Kautzman's Response due by 2/18/2020. (CS)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Seek Alternative Counsel, And Jurisdictional Issues filed by Galvanizers, Inc., K and K Construction and Repair, Inc.. (Hanson, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's Office added link. (cjs)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Seek Alternative Counsel, And Jurisdictional Issues filed by United States of America. (Wall, Sarah)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Seek Alternative Counsel, And Jurisdictional Issues by Paul Kautzman. (Johnson Aldrich, Leslie) Modified on 1/17/2020 to add link(cjs).
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Galvanizers, Inc., K and K Construction and Repair, Inc. re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 MEMORANDUM in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hanson, Stephen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Galvanizers, Inc., K and K Construction and Repair, Inc. .(Hanson, Stephen) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct corporate parent information (am).
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Galvanizers, Inc., K and K Construction and Repair, Inc.. (Hanson, Stephen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Galvanizers, Inc., K and K Construction and Repair, Inc.. (Hanson, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 2/20/2020. (AS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by United States of America. (Wall, Sarah)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2019-CV-04344. Filing fee: WAIVED filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvanizers, Inc. et al v. Kautzman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K and K Construction and Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen R. Hanson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galvanizers, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen R. Hanson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kautzman
Represented By: Jonathan T. Garaas
Represented By: Leslie Johnson Aldrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?