Ivey v. Kelly's Services et al
Plaintiff: Steven Ivey
Defendant: Kelly's Services, LM Windpower, North Dakota WSI, Nilles Law Firn, Kelly Services and LM Wind Power
Case Number: 3:2019cv00283
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 Report and Recommendations, Set Deadlines. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2020 (js)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to file an Objection to the #7 Report and Recommendations. Objection due by 3/4/2020. (AS) Distributed on 1/28/2020 (js).
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time re #7 Report and Recommendations, Set Deadlines by Steven Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge.(js) Distributed on 1/21/2020 (js). Modified on 1/28/2020 to correct docket text per the directive of Chambers - NEF Regenerated. (js)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Steven Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #4 Complaint filed by Steven Ivey be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 1/27/2020). (AS) Distributed on 1/13/2020 (as)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Steven Ivey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/21/2020. (pb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Ivey (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(am)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kelly's Services, LM Windpower, Nilles Law Firn, North Dakota WSI (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Steven Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (CS) Distributed on 12/26/2019 (pb). Modified on 12/30/2019 to add docket text per chambers request. (as)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Steven Ivey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/6/2020. (rh)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Mailing Envelope)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivey v. Kelly's Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly's Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Windpower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota WSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilles Law Firn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Wind Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?