Williams v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ralph Williams
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00286
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case assigned to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte as presiding judge and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. (as)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (as)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Davidson, Steven)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ralph Williams. (js)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ralph Williams. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/14/2020. (as)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (as)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000120) filed by Ralph Williams.(as) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (as).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Williams
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?