Balstad v. Uptown Hospitality, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Balstad
Defendant: Kevin Scott Vancamp, Jr. and Uptown Hospitality, Inc.
Garnishee: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT amended affidavit of service on North Dakota Insurance Commissioner on November 27, 2019 to document: #21 Reply to Response to Motion, by Brian Balstad. (Schneider, McLain)
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Brian Balstad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Admission of Service by ND Insurance Commissioner dated November 29, 2019)(Schneider, McLain) Modified on 2/24/2020 to add exhibit number(cjs).
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Penn-Star Insurance Company re #17 Response to Motion, #18 Affidavit, #19 Affidavit,, (Thornsjo, Dale)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Angel Goonan re #17 Response to Motion by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letters Penn-Star received from the North Dakota Insurance Department on December 20, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - National Association of Insurance Commissioners printout of the North Dakota Demographics for Penn-Star as an Active Surplus Lines Insurer, #3 Exhibit 3 - November 15, 1999 North Dakota Department of Insurance letter approving Penn-Star as a surplus lines insurer in North Dakota)(Thornsjo, Dale)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Mark R. Azman re #17 Response to Motion by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Thornsjo, Dale)
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Thornsjo, Dale)
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Brian Balstad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of service of summons and complaint as to Jondahl, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of service of summons and complaint as to Spicer, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of service of summons and complaint as to VanCamp, #6 Exhibit Miller-Shugart agreement, #7 Exhibit State court's findings of fact, order for entry of judgment, and judgment, #8 Exhibit Notice of entry of judgment, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of service - notice of entry of judgment, #10 Exhibit Letter to Penn-Star, #11 Exhibit Affidavit of service of garnishee summons and related documents - ND Insurance Dept, #12 Exhibit State court register of actions, #13 Exhibit Affidavit of service of garnishee summons and related documents - Penn-Star, #14 Exhibit Notice of appearance - Penn-Star, #15 Exhibit Penn-Star's objections, reservations and other defenses, #16 Exhibit Affidavit of Plaintiff)(Schneider, McLain)
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Brian Balstad. (Schneider, McLain)
January 24, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 NOTICE (Other). Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and refiled as NOTICE of Appearance at #14 . (pb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessie Leigh VanCamp on behalf of Kevin Scott Vancamp, Jr (pb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE by Kevin Scott Vancamp, Jr of Representation (VanCamp, Jessie) Modified to restrict access on 1/24/2020 (pb).
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (pb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 OBJECTION Garnishee Penn-Star Insurance Companys Objections, Reservations, and Other Defenses, and Garnishment Disclosure by Brian Balstad. (Schneider, McLain)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION re #1 Notice of Removal,,, by Brian Balstad. (Schneider, McLain)
January 3, 2020 Deadlines Terminated: NOTICE of Direct Assignments as to Kevin Scott Vancamp Jr. and Uptown Hospitality, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/16/2020 is CANCELLED. Documents filed in error. (js)
January 3, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment. Document filed in error. Clerk's Office restricted access to document. (js)
January 2, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment. Document filed in error. Clerk's Office restricted access to document. (js)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Penn-Star Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Azman, Mark)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penn-Star Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Global Indemnity Limited, Corporate Parent Penn-America Insurance Company for Penn-Star Insurance Company.. (Azman, Mark)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Azman on behalf of Penn-Star Insurance Company (Azman, Mark)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kevin Scott Vancamp, Jr. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/16/2020. (js) Modified on 1/3/2020 to restrict access. (js)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Uptown Hospitality, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/16/2020. (js) Modified on 1/2/2020 to restrict access. (js)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Brian Balstad. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/16/2020. (js)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Penn-Star Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/16/2020. (js)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Penn-Star Insurance Company from Grand Forks County District Court, case number 18-08-C-00502. Filing fee $400; receipt number 320000126 filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Garnishee Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Garnishee Disclosure form, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to Defendants, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Judgment Creditor to Renew Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Garnishee Fee, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Mark Mazaheri, #7 Exhibit 7 - Garnishment Disclosure, #8 Exhibit 8 - Certificate of Service, #9 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Service by Mail, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Appearance, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Filing, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Second Amended Complaint)(js) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/2/2020 with correct document - NEF Regenerated). (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balstad v. Uptown Hospitality, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark R. Azman
Represented By: Dale O. Thornsjo
Represented By: Lance D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Balstad
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Scott Vancamp, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas V. Omdahl
Represented By: Jessie Leigh VanCamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uptown Hospitality, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?