Acadia Insurance Company v. Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Acadia Insurance Company
Defendant: Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00008
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acadia Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Acadia Insurance Company. (Trapp, Kerry)
March 6, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim #12 by Acadia Insurance Company.(Trapp, Kerry)
February 21, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 NOTICE (Other). Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as Corporate Disclosure Statement at #16 ; and #14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Clerks office added links. (js)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
February 14, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc. (js)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 ANSWER and COUNTERCLAIM, and #16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc. (Hanson, Stephen) Modified on 2/21/2020 to add links and remove unnecessary docket text. (js)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE by Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc. Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Hanson, Stephen) Modified on 2/21/2020 to restrict access. (js)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Acadia Insurance Company by Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc..(Hanson, Stephen)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Hanson, II on behalf of Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc. (Hanson, Stephen)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding Judge, and referred to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (js)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Acadia Insurance Company. (js)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Acadia Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/18/2020. (js)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kerry A. Trapp. (pb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kerry A. Trapp (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1907300) by Acadia Insurance Company. (Trapp, Kerry) Modified to add receipt number on 2/7/2020 (pb).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin J. Kennedy. (pb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin J. Kennedy (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1907174) by Acadia Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Kevin) Modified to add receipt number on 2/7/2020 (pb).
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Acadia Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/5/2020. (as)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc. (as)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000149) filed by Acadia Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acadia Insurance Company v. Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Boneless Beef Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acadia Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Andrew Rauch
Represented By: Eric J. Steinhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?